EP1402994 - Machine tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states Toyoda Koki Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wakazono, Yoshio 166, Myouen-cho Minami-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Machida, Kazuo 1-5, Itakura-cho, 1-chome Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Iida, Wataru 13-69, Aza-higashichonaga Oaza-mori Jimokuji-cho Ama-gun Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Takeuchi, Katsuhiko 85, Hiruta Takatana-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/14] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03026385.9 | 24.07.1998 | [2004/14] | Priority number, date | JP19970198712 | 24.07.1997 Original published format: JP 19871297 | JP19980023523 | 04.02.1998 Original published format: JP 2352398 | [2004/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1402994 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1402994 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | [2005/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1402994 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q1/01, B23Q1/62 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
B23Q1/015 (EP,US);
B23Q1/626 (EP,US);
Y10T408/91 (EP,US);
Y10T409/307112 (EP,US);
Y10T409/307728 (EP,US);
Y10T409/309576 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/14] | B23Q1/62 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/14] | Title | German: | Werkzeugmaschine | [2004/14] | English: | Machine tool | [2004/14] | French: | Machine-outil | [2004/14] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/02] | 29.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 23.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98113942.1 / EP0893196 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0614724 (MAX RHODIUS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [X]EP0742072 (INGERSOLL MILLING MACHINE CO [US]) [X] 1-10,12,15,16 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO9727026 (RENAULT AUTOMATION [FR], et al) [XP] 1-6,8 * the whole document * |