EP1422131 - Roof module for motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Webasto AG Kraillinger Strasse 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE | [2005/17] |
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states Webasto Vehicle Systems International GmbH Kraillinger Strasse 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guicheteau, Jean-Luc 8 Square des Jardiniers 49300 Cholet / FR | [2004/22] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2005/17] |
Former [2004/22] | Bedenbecker, Markus Untertaxetweg 88 82131 Gauting / DE | Application number, filing date | 03026482.4 | 20.11.2003 | [2004/22] | Priority number, date | FR20020014639 | 22.11.2002 Original published format: FR 0214639 | [2004/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1422131 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1422131 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B62D65/00, B60J7/00 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
B60J7/003 (EP);
B62D65/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2005/07] |
Former [2004/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dachmodul für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2004/22] | English: | Roof module for motor vehicle | [2004/22] | French: | Module de pavillon pour véhicule automobile | [2004/22] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 27.11.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.03.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 21.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/52] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 21.02.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 21.02.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.03.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.01.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.01.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0203484 (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT]) [A] 1* column W *; | [Y]DE19902534 (WEBASTO KAROSSERIESYSTEME [DE]) [Y] 1,11 * column 2, line 46 - column 4, line 2; figures 1-4 *; | [YA]FR2786735 (WEBASTO SYSTEMES CARROSSERIE [FR]) [Y] 1,11 * page 3, line 1 - page 6, line 5; figures 1-3 * [A] 12 |