EP1416292 - Optical scanning radar system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Honda Giken Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Minami Aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kikuchi, Hayato Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg, et al C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03026540.9 | 15.10.1998 | [2004/19] | Priority number, date | JP19980043908 | 25.02.1998 Original published format: JP 4390898 | [2004/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1416292 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1416292 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/48, G01S17/93, G01S13/93, G01S13/42, G01S17/42 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
G01S7/4817 (EP,US);
G01S17/931 (EP,US);
G01S13/426 (EP,US);
G01S17/42 (EP,US);
G01S7/4811 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/19] | Title | German: | Geschwenktes optisches Radar System | [2004/19] | English: | Optical scanning radar system | [2004/19] | French: | Système radar optique à balayage | [2004/19] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 14.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98947893.8 / EP0997746 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH08313632 ; | [A]JPS62115389 ; | [A]JPH09178856 ; | [A]JPH0542144 ; | [Y]US5633705 (ASAYAMA YOSHIAKI [JP]) [Y] 1 * the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, & JP08313632 A 19961129 (OMRON CORP) [Y] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871031), vol. 011, no. 334, Database accession no. (P - 631), & JP62115389 A 19870527 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, & JP09178856 A 19970711 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930629), vol. 017, no. 342, Database accession no. (C - 1076), & JP05042144 A 19930223 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |