EP1422491 - Method, apparatus and program for setting a workpiece coordinate system origin in a surface property measuring machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitutoyo Corporation 20-1, Sakado 1-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-0012 / JP | [2017/39] |
Former [2004/22] | For all designated states Mitutoyo Corporation 20-1, Sakado 1-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 213-0012 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakurada, Junji c/o MSTI Inc. 1-2, Nishi 1-chome, Kita 7-jyo Kita-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkai-do 060-0807 / JP | 02 /
Kojima, Tsukasa c/o MSTI INC. 1-2, Nishi 1-chome, Kita 7-jyo Kita-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkai-do 060-0807 / JP | 03 /
Tamai, Toshiyuki c/o MSTI Inc. 1-2, Nishi 1-chome, Kita 7-jyo Kita-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkai-do 060-0807 / JP | [2017/28] |
Former [2004/22] | 01 /
Sakurada, Junji, c/o MSTI Inc. 1-2, Nishi 1-chome, Kita 7-jyo Kita-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkai-do 060-0807 / JP | ||
02 /
Kojima, Tsukasa, c/o MSTI Inc. 1-2, Nishi 1-chome, Kita 7-jyo Kita-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkai-do 060-0807 / JP | |||
03 /
Tamai, Toshiyuki, c/o MSTI Inc. 1-2, Nishi 1-chome, Kita 7-jyo Kita-ku Sapporo-shi Hokkai-do 060-0807 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/39] |
Former [2004/22] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03026962.5 | 25.11.2003 | [2004/22] | Priority number, date | JP20020340930 | 25.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002340930 | [2004/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1422491 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1422491 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | [2008/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1422491 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01B5/008, G01B21/04, G05B19/401 | [2004/22] | CPC: |
G01B21/045 (EP,US);
G01B5/012 (EP,US);
G01B5/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2017/39] |
Former [2009/16] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren, Vorrichtung und Programm zum Setzen des Ursprungs eines Koordinatensystems eines Werkstücks in einem Oberflächentaster | [2004/22] | English: | Method, apparatus and program for setting a workpiece coordinate system origin in a surface property measuring machine | [2004/22] | French: | Méthode, appareil et programme de placement de l'origine d'un système de coordonnées d'une pièce dans un appreil de mesure d'une surface | [2004/22] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 16.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.05.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.05.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 27.09.2017 | [2018/28] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4825394 (BEAMISH JERALD K [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * abstract * * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 55 * * column 21, line 46 - column 27, line 39 * * column 44, line 13 - line 17 *; | [X]US4914601 (SMYTH JR JOHN B [US]) [X] 1-26 * abstract * * column 4, line 49 - column 6, line 38 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US4962591 (ZELLER RUDOLF [DE], et al) [X] 1-26 * abstract * * column 3, line 22 - column 7, line 20 * * figures 1-4 *; | [XD]JPH11339052 (MITUTOYO CORP) [XD] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [XD]JP2000331171 (MITUTOYO CORP) [XD] 1-26* the whole document *; | [X]US2001045021 (MATSUDA JIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-26 * abstract * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0104] * * figures 1-9,10a * |