EP1424769 - Multi-phase mixer circuit and high frequency signal receiver using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/23] | Three-phase mixer circuit and high frequency signal receiver using the same | ||
[2006/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asayama, Sanae 17-20-1-815, Hanaomote-cho, Atsuta-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 456-0033 / JP | 02 /
Terao, Atsuhito 3-7, Tonomachi Gifu-shi, Gifu 500-8116 / JP | [2004/23] | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Avenue du Pailly 25 1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH | ||
Former [2004/23] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf SA 25, Avenue du Pailly 1220 Les Avanchets - Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 03027064.9 | 25.11.2003 | [2004/23] | Priority number, date | JP20020342004 | 26.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002342004 | [2004/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1424769 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1424769 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H03D7/12 | [2004/23] | CPC: |
H03D7/165 (EP,US);
H03D7/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/08] |
Former [2004/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mehrphasiger Mischer, und dessen Verwendung in einem Empfänger | [2006/11] | English: | Multi-phase mixer circuit and high frequency signal receiver using the same | [2006/11] | French: | Mélangeur multiphase, et son utilisation dans un récepteur | [2006/11] |
Former [2004/23] | Dreiphasiger Mischer , und dessen Verwendung in einem Empfänger | ||
Former [2004/23] | Three-phase mixer circuit and high frequency signal receiver using the same | ||
Former [2004/23] | Mélangeur à trois phases , et son utilisation dans un récepteur | Examination procedure | 02.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 27.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5483695 (PARDOEN MATTHIJS D [CH]) [A] 1-18 * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 22; figure 4 *; | [A]US5708383 (LEE JOHNNY CHUANG-LI [US]) [A] 1-18 * column 4, line 18 - line 33; figure 4 *; | [A]US6194947 (LEE KYEONGHO [KR], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 3, line 4 - column 5, line 48; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US6335952 (LEE KYEONGHO [KR], et al) [A] 1-18* column 7, line 66 - column 8, line 32; figures 8,13 *; | [A]US6385442 (VU HOAI XUAN [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 3, line 63 - column 6, line 31; figure 4 * |