EP1431163 - Hydraulic drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STILL GmbH Berzeliusstrasse 10 22113 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states STILL GMBH Berzeliusstrasse 10 22113 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stall, Eugen, Dr. Höfferhoferstrasse 74 53819 Neunkirchen / DE | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Geirhos, Johann, et al Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Geirhos, Johann, et al Linde Aktiengesellschaft, Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 03027134.0 | 26.11.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | DE2002159038 | 17.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10259038 | [2004/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1431163 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1431163 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | [2004/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1431163 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/093, B62D5/12, B62D5/06 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
B62D5/12 (EP,US);
B62D5/093 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/26] | B62D5/093, B62D5/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2005/36] |
Former [2004/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hydraulischer Antrieb | [2004/26] | English: | Hydraulic drive | [2004/26] | French: | Dispositif à actionnement hydraulique | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 01.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 25.10.2006 | SE | 25.01.2007 | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/25] | SE | 25.01.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0939818 ; | [Y]FR2482680 (DANFOSS AS [DK]) [Y] 1 * page 5, line 16 - line 31; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0407768 (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US6131389 (SOERENSEN SOEREN NYGAARD [DK]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1046570 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 1997, no. 06, & JP09039818 A 19970210 (SUMITOMO R KK) [Y] 1 * abstract * |