EP1424455 - Corner flashing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tholstrup, Martin Skovballevej 129 5700 Svendborg / DK | [2004/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/23] | Representative(s) | Tellefsen, Jens J., et al Patrade A/S Ceresbyen 75 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Tellefsen, Jens J., et al Patrade A/S, Fredens Torv 3A 8000 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 03027165.4 | 27.11.2003 | [2004/23] | Priority number, date | DK20020001844 | 29.11.2002 Original published format: DK 200201844 | DK20030000870 | 12.06.2003 Original published format: DK 200300870 | [2004/23] | Filing language | DA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1424455 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1424455 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E04D13/147 | [2004/23] | CPC: |
E04D13/1475 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/23] | Title | German: | Anschlussstreifen für Ecke | [2004/23] | English: | Corner flashing | [2004/23] | French: | Solin pour coin | [2004/23] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 09.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.07.2006 | BE | 05.07.2006 | CH | 05.07.2006 | CY | 05.07.2006 | CZ | 05.07.2006 | EE | 05.07.2006 | FI | 05.07.2006 | FR | 05.07.2006 | IT | 05.07.2006 | LI | 05.07.2006 | NL | 05.07.2006 | RO | 05.07.2006 | SI | 05.07.2006 | SK | 05.07.2006 | TR | 05.07.2006 | BG | 05.10.2006 | GR | 06.10.2006 | ES | 16.10.2006 | IE | 27.11.2006 | LU | 27.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | PT | 05.12.2006 | HU | 06.01.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2009/01] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
CH | 05.07.2006 | ||
CY | 05.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2006 | ||
EE | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
FR | 05.07.2006 | ||
IT | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
RO | 05.07.2006 | ||
SI | 05.07.2006 | ||
SK | 05.07.2006 | ||
TR | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
GR | 06.10.2006 | ||
ES | 16.10.2006 | ||
IE | 27.11.2006 | ||
LU | 27.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
HU | 06.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/37] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
CH | 05.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2006 | ||
EE | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
IT | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
RO | 05.07.2006 | ||
SI | 05.07.2006 | ||
SK | 05.07.2006 | ||
TR | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
GR | 06.10.2006 | ||
ES | 16.10.2006 | ||
IE | 27.11.2006 | ||
LU | 27.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
HU | 06.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
CH | 05.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2006 | ||
EE | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
IT | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
RO | 05.07.2006 | ||
SI | 05.07.2006 | ||
SK | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
GR | 06.10.2006 | ||
ES | 16.10.2006 | ||
IE | 27.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
HU | 06.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
CH | 05.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2006 | ||
EE | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
IT | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
RO | 05.07.2006 | ||
SI | 05.07.2006 | ||
SK | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
GR | 06.10.2006 | ||
ES | 16.10.2006 | ||
IE | 27.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
CH | 05.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
IT | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
RO | 05.07.2006 | ||
SI | 05.07.2006 | ||
SK | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
GR | 06.10.2006 | ||
ES | 16.10.2006 | ||
IE | 27.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
CH | 05.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
IT | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
RO | 05.07.2006 | ||
SI | 05.07.2006 | ||
SK | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
ES | 16.10.2006 | ||
IE | 27.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
CH | 05.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
IT | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
RO | 05.07.2006 | ||
SI | 05.07.2006 | ||
SK | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
ES | 16.10.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
CH | 05.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
IT | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
SI | 05.07.2006 | ||
SK | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
ES | 16.10.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
BE | 05.07.2006 | ||
CH | 05.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
SI | 05.07.2006 | ||
SK | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
ES | 16.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 05.07.2006 | |
CH | 05.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
SI | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
ES | 16.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 05.07.2006 | |
CZ | 05.07.2006 | ||
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
SI | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
ES | 16.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 05.07.2006 | |
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
NL | 05.07.2006 | ||
SI | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
ES | 16.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | CH | 05.07.2006 | |
FI | 05.07.2006 | ||
LI | 05.07.2006 | ||
SI | 05.07.2006 | ||
BG | 05.10.2006 | ||
ES | 16.10.2006 | ||
PT | 05.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | SI | 05.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE9306064U (DOMO, REISINGER & KOLLER PRODUKTIONS- UND VERTRIEBGESELLSCHAFT MBH) [X] 1-10 * figure 5 *; | [A]FR2735047 (LAHERA PRODUCTIONS SARL [FR]) [A] 1* figure 3 *; | [A]DE29814850U (KURT SCHADE GMBH & CO ING [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 3; claim 3 *; | [X]US5913779 (EDVARDSEN ALLAN [DK]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 4, paragraph 1 * * column 1, lines 18,19 * |