EP1408626 - Method for representing non-transmitted DTX bits in a frame to be sent in compressed mode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raaf, Bernhard Knollerweg 14 82061 Neuried / DE | 02 /
Senninger, Christian Pfingstrosenstrasse 61 81377 München / DE | [2004/16] | Application number, filing date | 03027382.5 | 24.11.2000 | [2004/16] | Priority number, date | DE1999156492 | 24.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19956492 | [2004/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1408626 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1408626 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04Q7/38 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
H04W88/181 (EP,US);
H04W28/06 (KR);
H04B7/2646 (EP,US);
H04L1/0009 (EP,US);
H04L1/0025 (EP,US);
H04L1/0068 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Abbilden von nicht zu sendenden DTX-Bits auf einen in einem Komprimiermodus zu sendenden Rahmen | [2004/16] | English: | Method for representing non-transmitted DTX bits in a frame to be sent in compressed mode | [2004/16] | French: | Procédé permettant de représenter des bits DTX ne devant pas être envoyés, sur une trame devant être envoyée en mode comprimé | [2004/16] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 12.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00988646.6 / EP1232583 | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/40] | IT | 24.05.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - "Multiplexing and channel coding (FDD)", 3G TS 25 212 VERSION 3.0.0, (199910), pages 37 - 50, XP002163232 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * |