EP1426723 - Heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calsonic Kansei Corporation 24-15, Minamidai 5-chome, Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states Calsonic Kansei Corporation 24-15, Minamidai 5-chome, Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujita, Takashi Calsonic Kansei Corporation 5-24-15, Minamidai Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | 02 /
Sasaki, Yoshihiro Calsonic Kansei Corporation 5-24-15, Minamidai Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | 03 /
Takahashi, Torahide Calsonic Kansei Corporation 5-24-15, Minamidai Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03027403.9 | 27.11.2003 | [2004/24] | Priority number, date | JP20020348156 | 29.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002348156 | [2004/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1426723 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/04, F28F1/04 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
F28D1/05391 (EP,US);
F28F9/0212 (EP,US);
F28F9/0246 (EP,US);
F28F9/0253 (EP,US);
F28F9/0282 (EP,US);
F28F9/185 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/09] |
Former [2004/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wärmeaustauscher | [2004/24] | English: | Heat exchanger | [2004/24] | French: | Echangeur de chaleur | [2004/24] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 08.10.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0747650 (SANDEN CORP [JP]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [XA]US5664432 (O'BRIEN STEPHEN W [US]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4-13; | [DA]US6155340 (FOLKEDAL LEIF [NO], et al) [DA] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US6216776 (KOBAYASHI OSAMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1150088 (MODINE MFG CO [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |