EP1428760 - Closure device for clips [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tipper Tie Alpina AG Ringstrasse 14 9201 Gossau / CH | [2004/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pargätzi, Max Talstrasse 60 9200 Gossau / CH | [2004/25] | Representative(s) | Blum, Rudolf Emil, et al E. BLUM & CO. AG Patent- und Markenanwälte VSP Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | Blum, Rudolf E., et al E. BLUM & CO. ,Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 03027663.8 | 03.12.2003 | [2004/25] | Priority number, date | CH20020002108 | 11.12.2002 Original published format: CH 21082002 | [2004/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1428760 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1428760 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65B51/04 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
B65B51/04 (EP);
B65B25/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2005/10] |
Former [2004/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verschliessanordnung für Verschlussclips | [2004/25] | English: | Closure device for clips | [2004/25] | French: | Dispositif de fermeture des clips | [2004/25] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 17.12.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.04.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06021465.7 / EP1747996 | Opposition(s) | 18.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.01.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1043923 (KLAUS MARTIN) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [Y]US2886816 (HILL JOHN W) [Y] 3 * column 1, lines 15-31; figures 2-4 *; | [Y]DE1094180 (NIEDECKER HERBERT) [Y] 5,6 * column 1, lines 1-13 * * column 3, lines 2-5 * * column 3, lines 18-23 * * figure - *; | [A]GB1094630 (JUAN MITJANS CANALDA, et al) [A] 1 * page 1, column L, line 10 - column R, line 67; figure 1 *; | [YDA]DE4013033 (WAELCHLI HANS [CH]) [YD] 1,3,5,6 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 50; figure - * [A] 2,4,7-11; | [Y]DE29714581U (JKL ROHEMA MASCHINENBAU GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1 * page 1, lines 16-18 * * page 3, lines 8-14 * * figure - * |