EP1426672 - Clamping device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Barkey, Volker Mönkebergstrasse 9 D-33619 Bielefeld / DE | [2004/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 03027680.2 | 03.12.2003 | [2004/24] | Priority number, date | DE2002218774U | 03.12.2002 Original published format: DE 20218774 U | [2004/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1426672 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16M11/12, F16M13/02, F16B2/06, F16B2/16 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
B01L9/50 (EP);
F16B2/065 (EP);
F16M13/022 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/24] | Title | German: | Geräteklemme | [2004/24] | English: | Clamping device | [2004/24] | French: | Dispositif de serrage | [2004/24] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 15.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/13] | 25.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2042056 (PITTAS A C) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0321120 (PACESETTER INFUSION LTD [US]) [X] 1-3 * column 11, line 15 - column 12, line 30 * * claim 9 * * figures 1,2,7-9 *; | [A]US4903929 (HOFFMAN RONALD W [US]) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5143468 (PAUSCH JOSEF [US]) [A] 1-5* figures 2-4 *; | [A]US5174533 (PRYOR JEFFREY W [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document * |