EP1431184 - Cigarettes packaging apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co. KG) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | [2004/46] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co.) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Focke, Heinz Moorstrasse 64 28283 Verden / DE | 02 /
Häfker, Thomas Paschkebergstrasse 24 27299 Langwedel / DE | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Bolte, Erich, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Bolte, Erich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03027917.8 | 04.12.2003 | [2004/26] | Priority number, date | DE2002159219 | 17.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10259219 | [2004/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1431184 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1431184 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | [2005/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1431184 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65B19/30, B65B19/28, A24C5/34 | [2005/46] | CPC: |
B65B19/28 (EP);
B65B19/105 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/26] | B65B19/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2006/29] |
Former [2004/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verpacken von Zigaretten | [2004/26] | English: | Cigarettes packaging apparatus | [2004/26] | French: | Dispositif pour l'emballage des cigarettes | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2005 | Observations by third parties | 25.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 17.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.06.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4174780 (BOLT REGINALD C [GB], et al) [X] 1-6,11 * column 3, line 35 - line 41 * * column 4, line 5 - line 16 * * figure 2 * [Y] 10; | [A]US4648232 (BRINKER ALFRED [DE], et al) [A] 7-9 * column 6, line 32 - line 37 *; | [Y]US4938237 (FOCKE HEINZ [DE], et al) [Y] 10 * figures 7,8 ** abstract *; | [X]US4962629 (FOCKE HEINZ [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-9 * figure 2 * * abstract * | other | US4487001 | US4607475 | US5259402 | US6446415 |