EP1449791 - Package and blank [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co. KG) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | [2004/46] |
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co.) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Focke, Heinz Moorstrasse 64 27283 Verden / DE | 02 /
Schönberger, Hans Kreienkamp 12 27283 Verden / DE | 03 /
Buse, Henry Dreessel Nr. 8 27374 Visselhövede / DE | [2004/35] | Representative(s) | Bolte, Erich, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | Bolte, Erich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03027918.6 | 21.01.2000 | [2004/35] | Priority number, date | DE1999112995 | 23.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19912995 | [2004/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1449791 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1449791 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/10 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
B65D5/662 (EP,US);
B65D85/1072 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2004/35] | Title | German: | Packung und Zuschnitt | [2004/35] | English: | Package and blank | [2004/35] | French: | Emballage et flan | [2004/35] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 12.11.2004 | Observations by third parties | 05.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00904940.4 / EP1163170 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 08.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 08.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.05.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.05.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4779723 (FOCKE HEINZ [DE], et al) [A] 1,14* abstract *; | [A]US5464148 (SCHOCH REINHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1,14 * abstract *; | [XA]EP0712784 (OTOR SA [FR]) [X] 14 * abstract * [A] 1; | [XA]EP0891931 (GD SPA [IT]) [X] 14 * abstract * [A] 1 | other | GB2175884 | EP0204933 | EP0205766 | EP0434962 | DE4032870 | US5129513 | US5341925 | US5460321 | EP0745541 | EP0764595 | EP0769457 | DE19637259 |