EP1434107 - Color image forming apparatus with adjustment of a speed mismatch between image carrier, intermediate transfer member and print medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | ||
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Ricoh Company Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | ||
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states Ricoh Company 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takehara, Atsushi 24-1-305, Sumiregaoka Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | [2004/27] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03028164.6 | 08.12.2003 | [2004/27] | Priority number, date | JP20020356216 | 09.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002356216 | [2004/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1434107 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1434107 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | [2004/28] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1434107 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | [2004/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1434107 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/00, G03G15/01, G03G15/16 | [2004/27] | CPC: |
G03G15/167 (EP,US);
G03G15/0194 (EP,US);
G03G15/0189 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00746 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00772 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00776 (EP,US);
G03G2215/0119 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/13] |
Former [2004/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Farbbildformungsapparat mit Regelung eines Geschwindigkeitsunterschiedes zwischen Bildträger, Zwischenträger und Aufzeichnungsträger | [2004/27] | English: | Color image forming apparatus with adjustment of a speed mismatch between image carrier, intermediate transfer member and print medium | [2004/27] | French: | Appareil de formation d'image en couleur avec regulation d'une difference de vitesse entre support d'image, élément de transfert intermédiaire et support d'impression | [2004/27] | Examination procedure | 08.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 08.01.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.05.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.02.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH10186786 ; | [A]EP0432476 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-12* column 3, line 24 - column 9, line 37 *; | [XY]US5313252 (CASTELLI VITTORIO [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-10,12 * column 3, line 47 - column 8, line 60; figures 1-5 * [Y] 5,6,11; | [XY]US5508789 (CASTELLI VITTORIO [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-10,12 * column 5, line 19 - column 8, line 65; figure 4 * [Y] 5,6,11; | [A]EP1031892 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0050]; figures 8,9; table 2 *; | [A]US2002025179 (TOYOHARA YUICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0082]; figures 1,7 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10186786 A 19980714 (CANON INC) [X] 1-4,9,10 * the whole document * [Y] 5,6,11 | Examination | JP2000155516 |