EP1405982 - A winding mechanism for an architectural covering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUNTER DOUGLAS INDUSTRIES B.V. Piekstraat 2 3008 AB Rotterdam / NL | [2004/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Welfonder, Konrad Loisachstrasse 23 27574 Bremerhaven / DE | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | Smith, Samuel Leonard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | Smith, Samuel Leonard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03028842.7 | 07.12.1998 | [2004/15] | Priority number, date | EP19970203900 | 12.12.1997 Original published format: EP 97203900 | EP19980201772 | 28.05.1998 Original published format: EP 98201772 | EP19980203010 | 09.09.1998 Original published format: EP 98203010 | [2004/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1405982 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1405982 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1405982 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/60, E06B9/78 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
F16D57/02 (EP,US);
E06B9/42 (EP,US);
E06B9/62 (EP,US);
E06B9/80 (EP,US);
E06B2009/808 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/15] | E06B9/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2004/15] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Aufwickeln einer Abdeckung | [2004/15] | English: | A winding mechanism for an architectural covering | [2004/15] | French: | Un dispositif d'enroulement pour une ouverture d'un bâtiment | [2004/15] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 29.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98310010.8 / EP0922831 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 12.02.2007 | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/40] | IT | 30.08.2006 | |
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | PT | 12.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB319811 (POLLARD & COMPANY LTD E, et al) [A] 1-14 * page 2, lines 58-93 *; | [A]GB1357106 (FERGUSON LTD HARRY) [A] 1-14 * page 2, lines 24-60; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US4513805 (MASE RYOICHI [JP]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]DE9203450U (TV_MAINROLLO GMBH) [A] 1-14 * figure 1; claims 1-3 *; | [A]US5355979 (STEPHAN CHRISTOPH H [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US5421221 (WARCHOCKI MARK [US]) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [A]US5449054 (WIESE HEINER [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]EP0697541 (TOK BEARING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US5634507 (KWOKA GEORG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * column 3, line 51 - column 5, line 13; figures 1,4,5 * |