EP1439325 - Friction wheel gearing, in particular toroidal transmission with mechanically coupled rollers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2004/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolf, Lothar Schlierseestrasse 67 81539 München / DE | 02 /
Ginglas, Eduard Hohenstaufenstrasse 34 C 86199 Augsburg / DE | 03 /
Ohnemus, Ulrich Frühlingstrasse 8 82285 Hattenhofen / DE | [2004/30] | Application number, filing date | 03029258.5 | 18.12.2003 | [2004/30] | Priority number, date | DE2003101160 | 15.01.2003 Original published format: DE 10301160 | [2004/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1439325 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1439325 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16H15/38 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
F16H15/38 (EP);
F16H61/664 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/14] |
Former [2004/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Reibradgetriebe, insbesondere Toroidgetriebe mit mechanisch gekoppelten Reibrollen | [2004/30] | English: | Friction wheel gearing, in particular toroidal transmission with mechanically coupled rollers | [2004/30] | French: | Transmission à roues de friction, notamment transmission toroidale avec rouleaux de traction couplés mécaniquement | [2004/30] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 29.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/48] | 15.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB482493 (GEN MOTORS CORP) [X] 1,2,7,10,11,13 * the whole document *; | [X]DE702100 (GEN MOTORS CORP) [X] 1-3,7,9,10,13 * the whole document *; | [X]US2959973 (MADSON CHRIS W) [X] 1,2,7,10,13,14* the whole document *; | [X]US3371546 (SPANGLER ELSON B, et al) [X] 1,2,7,9,12 * the whole document *; | [X]US3394617 (FRANK DICKENBROCK) [X] 1,2,7,10,11,13 * figure - * | by applicant | EP0832376 |