EP1447326 - Aircraft cockpit door [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAMCO CORPORATION 6-11-25 Osawa Mitaka Tokyo / JP | [2006/21] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states JAMCO CORPORATION 6-11-25 Osawa Mitaka, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sekikawa, Yasuo c/o Jamco Corporation 6-11-25, Osawa Mitaka Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kasuya, Toshihisa c/o Jamco Corporation 6-11-25, Osawa Mitaka Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Watanabe, Tadashi c/o Jamco Corporation 6-11-25, Osawa Mitaka Tokyo / JP | [2006/21] |
Former [2004/34] | 01 /
Sekikawa, Yasuo c/o Jamco Corporaton 6-11-25, Osawa Mitaka Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Kasuya, Toshihisa c/o Jamco Corporaton 6-11-25, Osawa Mitaka Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Watanabe, Tadashi c/o Jamco Corporaton 6-11-25, Osawa Mitaka Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 03029849.1 | 24.12.2003 | [2004/34] | Priority number, date | JP20030035958 | 14.02.2003 Original published format: JP 2003035958 | [2004/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1447326 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1447326 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B64D45/00 | [2004/34] | CPC: |
B64C1/1469 (EP,US);
B64D45/0028 (EP,US);
B64C2001/009 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2005/19] |
Former [2004/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Cockpittür | [2004/34] | English: | Aircraft cockpit door | [2004/34] | French: | Porte d'accès au cockpit | [2004/34] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 31.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.03.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.03.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3704845 (ORD MICHAEL) [Y] 1 * column 2, lines 54-58 * * column 3, lines 5-12; figure -; claim 3 *; | [Y]CH664408 (KONRAD KNOEPFEL) [Y] 1* page 2, column R, lines 11-38,61-64; figure - *; | [Y]DE19856250 (AUDI AG [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 1, lines 21-27,45-51-57-65; figure - * |