EP1433965 - Split type connecting rod [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken Shizuoka 438-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakajima, Akitoshi, Yamaha Hatsudoki K.K. 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | 02 /
Kikuchi, Satoshi, Yamaha Hatsudoki K.K. 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | 03 /
Kubota, Tsuyoshi, Yamaha Hatsudoki K.K. 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | 04 /
Isobe, Tsuneo, Yamaha Hatsudoki K.K. 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | 05 /
Iwasaki, Shinya, Yamaha Hatsudoki K.K. 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | [2004/27] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03029941.6 | 29.12.2003 | [2004/27] | Priority number, date | JP20020378020 | 26.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002378020 | JP20030315615 | 08.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003315615 | [2004/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1433965 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1433965 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | [2006/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1433965 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16C9/04 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
F16C9/045 (EP,US);
F16C33/08 (EP,US);
F16C41/008 (EP,US);
F16C7/023 (EP,US);
Y10S384/906 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2159 (EP,US);
Y10T74/216 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/27] | F16C9/04, F16C33/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/27] | Title | German: | Pleuel mit einem geteilten Pleuelstangenkopf | [2004/27] | English: | Split type connecting rod | [2004/27] | French: | Bielle à tête divisée | [2004/27] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 09.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.10.2009 | BE | 14.10.2009 | CY | 14.10.2009 | CZ | 14.10.2009 | DK | 14.10.2009 | EE | 14.10.2009 | FI | 14.10.2009 | IT | 14.10.2009 | NL | 14.10.2009 | RO | 14.10.2009 | SE | 14.10.2009 | SI | 14.10.2009 | SK | 14.10.2009 | TR | 14.10.2009 | IE | 29.12.2009 | LU | 29.12.2009 | CH | 31.12.2009 | LI | 31.12.2009 | BG | 14.01.2010 | GR | 15.01.2010 | ES | 25.01.2010 | PT | 15.02.2010 | HU | 15.04.2010 | MC | 01.07.2010 | [2012/44] |
Former [2011/44] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CY | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
TR | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 29.12.2009 | ||
LU | 29.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
HU | 15.04.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 29.12.2009 | ||
LU | 29.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
HU | 15.04.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 29.12.2009 | ||
LU | 29.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
IT | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 29.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 29.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
IE | 29.12.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
GR | 15.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SK | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
DK | 14.10.2009 | ||
EE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
RO | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
BG | 14.01.2010 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/29] | AT | 14.10.2009 | |
BE | 14.10.2009 | ||
FI | 14.10.2009 | ||
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 14.10.2009 | |
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
SI | 14.10.2009 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 14.10.2009 | |
SE | 14.10.2009 | ||
ES | 25.01.2010 | ||
PT | 15.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 25.01.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3576353 (BARKER NOBEL G, et al) [X] 1,3-5,7-9,12,21,22 * the whole document * [A] 2; | [A]US4693139 (MUKAI MASATO [JP], et al); | [X]DE3618742 (GLYCO METALL WERKE [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,7-9,12,21,22 * the whole document *; | [A]US5208979 (SCHMIDT HOWARD [US]); | [A]US6125536 (SPURNY DIETER [DE]); | [XA]US6312159 (ISHIDA MASAO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7-9,12-15,20-22 * column 5, lines 36-38 * * column 7, line 42 - column 8, line 65; figure - * [A] 2,10 | by applicant | JPH0674237 |