EP1308731 - Apparatus for use in automated analyzer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics Inc. 511 Benedict Avenue Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2008/17] |
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states Bayer Corporation 333 Coney Street East Walpole, MA 02032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carey, Glen A. 12680 Robson Road., Grafton OH 44044 / US | 02 /
Lewis Scott C. 426 Meadowbrook Drive Huntington Valley Pennsylvania 19006 / US | 03 /
Mann, Raymond A. 52 Rosa Street, Kipton OH 44049 / US | 04 /
Whitesel, Mary Beth 18555 Mennell Road, Grafton OH 44044 / US | 05 /
Polaniec, James P. 34464 Fortune Court, North Ridgeville OH 44039 / US | 06 /
Woyansky, George J. 1436 Hunters Chase Drive, Apt.2d, Westlake OH 44145 / US | 07 /
Pabst, Stefan R. 21484 Hawley Road, Wellington OH 44090 / US | 08 /
Klingshirn, Frank C. 8045 Coon Club Road, Medina OH 44256 / US | [2003/39] |
Former [2003/19] | 01 /
Carey, Glen A. 12680 Robson Road., Grafton OH 44044 / US | ||
02 /
Lewis Scott C. 864 Crosse Avenue., Amherst OH 44001 / US | |||
03 /
Mann, Raymond A. 52 Rosa Street, Kipton OH 44049 / US | |||
04 /
Whitesel, Mary Beth 37545 Crook Street, Grafton OH 44044 / US | |||
05 /
Polaniec, James P. 34464 Fortune Court, North Ridgeville OH 44039 / US | |||
06 /
Woyansky, George J. 1436 Hunters Chase Drive, Apt.2d, Westlake OH 44145 / US | |||
07 /
Pabst, Stefan R. 21484 Hawley Road, Wellington OH 44090 / US | |||
08 /
Klingshirn, Frank C. 8045 Coon Club Road, Medina OH 44256 / US | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG CT IP Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/42] | Greene, Simon Kenneth, et al Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2003/19] | Froud, Clive, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 03075072.3 | 21.02.1992 | [2003/19] | Priority number, date | US19910665196 | 04.03.1991 Original published format: US 665196 | [2003/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1308731 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1308731 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/02, B01L3/00 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
B01L3/508 (EP,US);
G01N21/76 (EP,US);
G01N35/021 (EP,US);
G01N35/025 (EP,US);
G01N35/1002 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0854 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00386 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00396 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00524 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00752 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0441 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0443 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0465 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0484 (EP,US);
G01N2035/0486 (EP,US);
G01N2035/1025 (EP,US);
G01N35/0098 (EP,US);
G01N35/1065 (EP,US);
Y02A90/10 (EP,US);
Y10S215/01 (EP,US);
Y10S215/03 (EP,US);
Y10S215/08 (EP,US);
Y10T436/11 (EP,US);
Y10T436/113332 (EP,US);
Y10T436/114165 (EP,US);
Y10T436/114998 (EP,US);
Y10T436/119163 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/19] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Anwendung in einem Analyseautomat | [2003/19] | English: | Apparatus for use in automated analyzer | [2003/19] | French: | Dispositif utilisé dans un appareil d'analyse automatique | [2003/19] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 19.11.2004 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 17.01.2005 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 21.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 13.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/27] | 18.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/27] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92301483.1 / EP0502638 | EP99203974.3 / EP0984284 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 09.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 02.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 13.01.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   09.07.2003 | 13.01.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   09.07.2003 | 13.01.2003 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   09.07.2003 | 13.01.2003 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   09.07.2003 | 13.01.2003 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   09.07.2003 | 13.01.2003 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   09.07.2003 | 13.01.2003 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   09.07.2003 | 28.02.2003 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   01.09.2003 | 29.02.2004 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2004 | 28.02.2009 | 18   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0289789 (JAPAN TECTRON INSTR CORP [JP]) [AD] 1,7,21 * column 4, lines 29-50 * * column 12, lines 50-58 *; | [A]US4785953 (BUCHHOLZ JOHN F [US], et al) [A] 2,3 * abstract *; | [A]US4805469 (COMMARMOT ROGER [FR]) [A] 7,21 * abstract *; | [AD]US4906433 (MINEKANE TOMIHARU [JP]) [AD] 7,21* column 1, lines 20-50 *; | [AD]EP0410645 (TECHNICON INSTR [US], et al) [AD] 1,7,21 * abstract * * page 4, lines 35,36 * |