EP1316565 - Wet strength agent and method for production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | For:SE
Eka Chemicals AB 445 80 Bohus / SE | [2007/21] |
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states Eka Chemicals AB 445 80 Bohus / SE | ||
For all designated states Akzo Nobel NV Postbus 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gorzynski, Marek Am Courtenbachshof 3 52349 Düren / DE | 02 /
Biermann, Christian Voigtstrasse 19 50170 Kerpen-Buir / DE | 03 /
Macherey, Heribert J. Altenweiher 15 52372 Kreuzau / DE | 04 /
Andersson, Arne Dagsländevägen 2 444 46 Stenungsund / SE | [2003/23] | Application number, filing date | 03075360.2 | 14.11.2000 | [2003/23] | Priority number, date | EP19990850174 | 19.11.1999 Original published format: EP 99850174 | US19990166564P | 19.11.1999 Original published format: US 166564 P | [2003/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1316565 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1316565 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | [2003/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1316565 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/02, C08G69/48, C08G73/02, D21H21/20, D21H17/55 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
C08F8/00 (EP);
C08F265/10 (EP);
C08F271/00 (EP);
C08F283/04 (EP);
C08F285/00 (EP);
C08G73/0286 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08F8/00, C08F20/00 (EP);
C08L51/003, C08L2666/02 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/23] | Title | German: | Nassverfestigungsmittel und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [2003/23] | English: | Wet strength agent and method for production thereof | [2003/23] | French: | Agent conferant une résistance à l'état humide et procédé de son fabrication | [2003/23] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 11.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00980181.2 / EP1242466 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.05.2007 | BE | 30.05.2007 | CH | 30.05.2007 | CY | 30.05.2007 | DK | 30.05.2007 | LI | 30.05.2007 | NL | 30.05.2007 | TR | 30.05.2007 | GR | 31.08.2007 | PT | 30.10.2007 | FI | 14.11.2007 | GB | 14.11.2007 | IE | 14.11.2007 | IT | 14.11.2007 | LU | 14.11.2007 | ES | 15.11.2007 | SE | 15.11.2007 | FR | 30.11.2007 | MC | 30.11.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
CY | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
GB | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
IT | 14.11.2007 | ||
LU | 14.11.2007 | ||
ES | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
FR | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
CY | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
GB | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
IT | 14.11.2007 | ||
ES | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
FR | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
GB | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
IT | 14.11.2007 | ||
ES | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
FR | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
GB | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
IT | 14.11.2007 | ||
ES | 15.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/04] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
GB | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
IT | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
IT | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
IT | 14.11.2007 | ||
SE | 15.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
IT | 14.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
IT | 14.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
IT | 14.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
DK | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
BE | 30.05.2007 | ||
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
CH | 30.05.2007 | ||
LI | 30.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CH | 30.05.2007 | |
LI | 30.05.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US3922243 (ALDRICH PAUL H, et al) [DA] 1-4,14 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4416729 (KILLAT GEORGE R [US], et al) [DA] 1-4,14 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9836127 (CYTEC TECH CORP [US]) [DA] 5-9,13* the whole document *; | [DA]US5955567 (BIGORRA LLOSAS JOAQUIM [ES], et al) [DA] 1-4,14 * the whole document * |