EP1362804 - Conveyer system and method for conveying products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VANDERLANDE INDUSTRIES NEDERLAND B.V. Vanderlandelaan 2 5466 RB Veghel / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states VANDERLANDE INDUSTRIES NEDERLAND B.V. Vanderlandelaan 2 NL-5466 RB Veghel / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van den Goor, Jacobus Marie Gerwenseweg 54 5674 SH Nuenen / NL | [2003/47] | Representative(s) | Dorna, Peter Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/47] | Dorna, Peter Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 03075697.7 | 10.03.2003 | [2003/47] | Priority number, date | NL20021020166 | 13.03.2002 Original published format: NL 1020166 | [2003/47] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1362804 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1362804 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65G17/00, B65G17/34, B65G47/34 | [2003/47] | CPC: |
B65G17/002 (EP);
B65G17/345 (EP);
B65G47/34 (EP);
B65G47/96 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/38] |
Former [2003/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fördervorrichtung und Verfahren zum Fördern von Produkten | [2003/47] | English: | Conveyer system and method for conveying products | [2003/47] | French: | Installation de transport et méthode pour transporter des produits | [2003/47] | Examination procedure | 27.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/14] | 03.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.02.2006 | BE | 08.02.2006 | CH | 08.02.2006 | CY | 08.02.2006 | CZ | 08.02.2006 | EE | 08.02.2006 | FI | 08.02.2006 | LI | 08.02.2006 | RO | 08.02.2006 | SI | 08.02.2006 | SK | 08.02.2006 | TR | 08.02.2006 | IE | 10.03.2006 | LU | 10.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | BG | 08.05.2006 | SE | 08.05.2006 | GR | 09.05.2006 | PT | 10.07.2006 | HU | 09.08.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2006 | ||
EE | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
RO | 08.02.2006 | ||
SI | 08.02.2006 | ||
SK | 08.02.2006 | ||
TR | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 10.03.2006 | ||
LU | 10.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
GR | 09.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
HU | 09.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2006 | ||
EE | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
RO | 08.02.2006 | ||
SI | 08.02.2006 | ||
SK | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 10.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
GR | 09.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
HU | 09.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2006 | ||
EE | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
RO | 08.02.2006 | ||
SI | 08.02.2006 | ||
SK | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 10.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
GR | 09.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
RO | 08.02.2006 | ||
SI | 08.02.2006 | ||
SK | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 10.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
GR | 09.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
RO | 08.02.2006 | ||
SI | 08.02.2006 | ||
SK | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 10.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
IT | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
RO | 08.02.2006 | ||
SI | 08.02.2006 | ||
SK | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 10.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
IT | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
SI | 08.02.2006 | ||
SK | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 10.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
BE | 08.02.2006 | ||
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
SI | 08.02.2006 | ||
SK | 08.02.2006 | ||
IE | 10.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
PT | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
SI | 08.02.2006 | ||
SK | 08.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
SI | 08.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
BG | 08.05.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
SI | 08.02.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
SE | 08.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 08.02.2006 | |
CH | 08.02.2006 | ||
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
SI | 08.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 08.02.2006 | |
FI | 08.02.2006 | ||
LI | 08.02.2006 | ||
SI | 08.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 08.02.2006 | |
SI | 08.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 08.02.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3550748 (HAUER WERNER); | [AD]EP0456297 (VANDERLANDE IND NEDERLAND [NL]); | [A]NL9800010 (RAPISTAN VAN DER LANDE BV [NL]) [A] 6-8 * page 6, line 3 - line 19; figure 1 *; | [X]FR2805530 (TELEFLEX GALLET [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,9 * page 9, line 21 - line 27 * * page 11, line 20 - line 23; figures 1,6 * | by applicant | US3550748 | EP0456297 |