EP1348621 - Window attachment system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states The Boeing Company P.O. Box 3707, M.S. 13-08 Seattle Washington 98124-2207 / US | ||
Former [2003/40] | For all designated states THE BOEING COMPANY P.O. Box 3707, M.S. 13-08 Seattle, Washington 98124-2207 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hopkins, Jonathan L. 3333 164th St Sw No. 1124 Lynnwood, WA 98037 / US | 02 /
Ely, Paul A. 15698 168th Ave SE Monroe, WA 98272 / US | 03 /
Chue, Edward H. 1901 Merill Creek Pkwy Everett, WA 98203 / US | [2003/40] | Representative(s) | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2003/40] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 03075854.4 | 24.03.2003 | [2003/40] | Priority number, date | US20020106688 | 25.03.2002 Original published format: US 106688 | [2003/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1348621 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1348621 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | [2004/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1348621 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B64C1/14 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
B64C1/1492 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/40] |
Former [2003/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fensterbefestigungssystem und Methode zur Fensterbefestigung | [2003/40] | English: | Window attachment system and method | [2003/40] | French: | Dispositif et méthode de fixation d'une fenêtre | [2003/40] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 19.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.08.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2722170 (JOHAN BROBERG GEORGE KARL) [Y] 2,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US4541595 (FIALA PETER E [US], et al) [A] 1-22* the whole document *; | [XY]US6082674 (WHITE WALTER LEON [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * column 1, lines 41-51 * * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 23 * * column 4, lines 52-59 * * column 5, lines 29-45; figure - * [Y] 2,11; | [XY]US6227491 (STEPHAN WALTER A [AT], et al) [X] 1,10 * column 1, lines 22-46 * * column 2, lines 55-61 * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 54 * * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 31 * * column 6, line 56 - column 7, line 13; figure - * [Y] 2,11 |