EP1350442 - Contouring toothbrush head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/33] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York NY 10022-7499 / US | ||
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hohlbein, Douglas J. 45 Diverty Road Pennington, New Jersey 08534 / US | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | Jenkins, Peter David, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2003/41] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 03075927.8 | 31.03.2003 | [2003/41] | Priority number, date | US20020109637 | 01.04.2002 Original published format: US 109637 | [2003/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1350442 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1350442 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A46B9/04 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
A46B15/0002 (EP,US);
A46B9/04 (EP,KR,US);
A46B15/0032 (EP,US);
A46B5/002 (EP,US);
A46B5/0025 (EP,US);
A46B7/06 (EP,KR,US);
A46B9/026 (EP,US);
A46B9/028 (EP,US);
A46B9/045 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/41] | Title | German: | Zahnbürste mit Konturanpassbarem Kopfteil | [2003/41] | English: | Contouring toothbrush head | [2003/41] | French: | Tête de brosse à dents conformable | [2003/41] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 27.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.08.2010 | CY | 18.08.2010 | CZ | 18.08.2010 | DK | 18.08.2010 | EE | 18.08.2010 | FI | 18.08.2010 | RO | 18.08.2010 | SE | 18.08.2010 | SI | 18.08.2010 | SK | 18.08.2010 | BG | 18.11.2010 | GR | 19.11.2010 | PT | 20.12.2010 | LU | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | [2013/25] |
Former [2011/49] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
RO | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
EE | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SK | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
DK | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SE | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
GR | 19.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
CY | 18.08.2010 | ||
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
BG | 18.11.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 18.08.2010 | |
FI | 18.08.2010 | ||
SI | 18.08.2010 | ||
PT | 20.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 18.08.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US301644 (THOMPSON) [A] 1,18 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2702914 (KITTLE LEVI O, et al) [Y] 8 * column W *; | [A]US4277862 (WEIDEMAN CHRISTIAAN R) [A] 1,18* column W *; | [YA]EP0360766 (MARINO ANTONIO) [Y] 3,16,19 * the whole document * [A] 1,18; | [Y]WO9818364 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 10,15 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5930860 (SHIPP ANTHONY D [US]) [Y] 9 * column W *; | [YA]WO0064307 (KAO CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 11,12 * the whole document * [A] 1,3,18; | [Y]WO0076369 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-12,14-19 * the whole document *; | [YA]US6311358 (SOETEWEY LODE [FR], et al) [Y] 7 * column W * [A] 1,18; | [Y]US6314606 (HOHLBEIN DOUGLAS J [US]) [Y] 1-3,5-12,14-19 * column W *; | [EAY]WO03030680 (GLAXOSMITHKLINE CONSUMER HEALT [DE], et al) [E] 1,2,14,17,18 * the whole document * [A] 3-6,11 [Y] 9,10,15 | by applicant | WO0076369 |