EP1359565 - A general 2 voltage levels driving scheme for cholesterical liquid crystal displays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Industrial Technology Research Institute 195 Chung Hsing Road, Sec. 4 Chu Tung, Hsin Chu Taiwan 310 / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states Industrial Technology Research Institute 195 Chung Hsing Road Sec. 4 Chu Tung, Hsin Chu Taiwan 310 / CN | ||
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mi, Xiang-Dong, c/o Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Stephenson, Stanley Ward, Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2003/45] | Representative(s) | Andrews, Martyn Peter, et al Rouse Patents 11th Floor, Exchange Tower 1 Harbour Exchange Square London E14 9GE / GB | [2011/03] |
Former [2007/45] | Hyden, Martin Douglas, et al Rouse Patents 1st Floor 228-240 Banbury Road Oxford OX2 7BY / GB | ||
Former [2003/45] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 03076158.9 | 22.04.2003 | [2003/45] | Priority number, date | US20020138985 | 03.05.2002 Original published format: US 138985 | [2003/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1359565 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1359565 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
G09G3/3629 (EP,US);
G02F1/13718 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0486 (EP,US);
G09G2310/06 (EP,US);
G09G2320/02 (EP,US);
G09G3/2014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/47] |
Former [2003/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Steuerungsverfahren mit zwei verschiedenen Versorgungsspannungen für cholesterische Flüssigkristallanzeige | [2003/45] | English: | A general 2 voltage levels driving scheme for cholesterical liquid crystal displays | [2003/45] | French: | Méthode de commande à deux niveaux de tension pour dispositif d'affichage à cristaux liquides cholesteriques | [2003/45] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 04.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/30] | 06.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.2008 | 30.04.2013 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001048414 (YAMAKAWA EIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0068] - [0074]; figure 4 *; | [X] - RYBALOCHKA A ET AL, SIMPLE DRIVE SCHEME FOR BISTABLE CHOLESTERIC LCDS, 2001 SID INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS. SAN JOSE, CA, JUNE 5 - 7, 2001, SID INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS, SAN JOSE, CA : SID, US, PAGE(S) 882-885, (200106), XP001054108 [X] 1,9,10 * the whole document * |