EP1369031 - A device for automatically milking an animal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | Revocation of patent | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lely Enterprises AG Bützenweg 20 6300 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states Lely Enterprises AG Bützenweg 20 6300 ZUG / CH | ||
Former [2003/50] | For all designated states Lely Enterprises AG 20 Bützenweg 6300 ZUG / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van den Berg, Karel 5, Boterbloemstraat 2971 BR Bleskensgraaf / NL | 02 /
Vijverberg, Helena Geralda Maria 129 Burgemeester Rippingstraat 3145 TM Maassluis / NL | 03 /
Voogd, Lucien Eliza Niels 32A Schaikseweg 4143 HG Leerdam / NL | [2003/50] | Representative(s) | Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1 3147 PB Maassluis / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/50] | Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | Application number, filing date | 03076212.4 | 28.04.2003 | [2003/50] | Priority number, date | NL20021020805 | 06.06.2002 Original published format: NL 1020805 | [2003/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1369031 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1369031 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1369031 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01J5/013, A01J5/01 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
A01J5/01 (EP,US);
A01J5/0133 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, NL, SE [2004/41] |
Former [2003/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum automatischen Melken eines Tieres | [2003/50] | English: | A device for automatically milking an animal | [2003/50] | French: | Dispositif pour traire automatiquement un animal | [2003/50] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 12.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.06.2006
05.07.2006
ADMISSIBLE DeLaval International AB P O Box 39 147 21 TUMBA / SE Opponent's representative Lerwill, John, et al, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.06.2006
DeLaval International AB P O Box 39 147 21 TUMBA / SE Opponent's representative Lerwill, John, et al, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | 07.08.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.12.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.10.2009 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/22] | 01.12.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 01.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4771007 (TIPPETTS EARL L [US], et al) [A] 1,4* column 2, line 17 - line 48; figures 1-3 *; | [X]WO9701953 (MELTEC MASCHINEN GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,4 * page 2 - page 5; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US6371046 (PETTERSON TORBJORN [SE], et al) [X] 1,4 * column 5, line 29 - line 45; figure 8 * |