EP1361256 - Method for preparing granulates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2010 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Latexfalt B.V. P.O. Box 6 2396 ZG Koudekerk a/d Rijn / NL | [2003/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lommerts, Bert Jan Middenweg 41 1703 RB Heerhugowaard / NL | 02 /
Besamusca, Jeroen Theodorus Maria Heemraadserf 9 3991 KA Houten / NL | [2003/46] | Representative(s) | Jorritsma, Ruurd Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Jorritsma, Ruurd Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 03076339.5 | 06.05.2003 | [2003/46] | Priority number, date | NL20021020543 | 06.05.2002 Original published format: NL 1020543 | [2003/46] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1361256 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1361256 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08L95/00 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
C08J3/12 (EP);
C08L95/00 (EP);
C08J2395/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L95/00, C08L23/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Granulat | [2003/46] | English: | Method for preparing granulates | [2003/46] | French: | Procédés de fabrication de granulats | [2003/46] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 07.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.06.2009 | CY | 10.06.2009 | CZ | 10.06.2009 | DK | 10.06.2009 | EE | 10.06.2009 | FI | 10.06.2009 | IT | 10.06.2009 | RO | 10.06.2009 | SI | 10.06.2009 | SK | 10.06.2009 | TR | 10.06.2009 | BG | 10.09.2009 | SE | 10.09.2009 | GR | 11.09.2009 | ES | 21.09.2009 | PT | 10.10.2009 | HU | 11.12.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
CY | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
IT | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
GR | 11.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
HU | 11.12.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
CY | 10.06.2009 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
IT | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
GR | 11.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
IT | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
GR | 11.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
GR | 11.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
DK | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
BG | 10.09.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SK | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
CZ | 10.06.2009 | ||
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
RO | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
EE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SI | 10.06.2009 | ||
SE | 10.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
FI | 10.06.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2000139 (BASF AG) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]FR2303838 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] * the whole document * |