EP1475152 - Test device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CEDI Diagnostics B.V. Edelhertweg 15 8219 PH Lelystad / NL | [2004/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keizer, Gerrit Dirk Swingdreef 27 3845 BV Harderwijk / NL | 02 /
Schielen, Wilhelmus Joseph Gerardus Het Bildt 153 8245 CN Lelystad / NL | [2004/46] | Representative(s) | Prins, Adrianus Willem, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | Prins, Adrianus Willem, Mr. Ir., et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 03076382.5 | 08.05.2003 | [2004/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1475152 | Date: | 10.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1475152 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, G01N33/543 | [2004/46] | CPC: |
B01L3/502 (EP,US);
B01L3/50825 (EP,US);
G01N33/54366 (EP,US);
B01L2200/16 (EP,US);
B01L2300/042 (EP,US);
B01L2300/047 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0663 (EP,US);
B01L2300/069 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0478 (EP,US);
B01L3/0217 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/46] | Title | German: | Test-Vorrichtung | [2004/46] | English: | Test device | [2004/46] | French: | Dispositif pour effectuer un essai | [2004/46] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 28.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2006 | BE | 22.11.2006 | CH | 22.11.2006 | CY | 22.11.2006 | CZ | 22.11.2006 | EE | 22.11.2006 | FI | 22.11.2006 | LI | 22.11.2006 | NL | 22.11.2006 | RO | 22.11.2006 | SI | 22.11.2006 | SK | 22.11.2006 | TR | 22.11.2006 | BG | 22.02.2007 | DK | 22.02.2007 | SE | 22.02.2007 | GR | 23.02.2007 | ES | 05.03.2007 | PT | 23.04.2007 | IE | 08.05.2007 | IT | 08.05.2007 | LU | 08.05.2007 | HU | 23.05.2007 | MC | 31.05.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/41] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
CY | 22.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
EE | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
IE | 08.05.2007 | ||
IT | 08.05.2007 | ||
LU | 08.05.2007 | ||
HU | 23.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2009/38] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
CY | 22.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
EE | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
IE | 08.05.2007 | ||
LU | 08.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
EE | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
IE | 08.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
IE | 08.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
SI | 22.11.2006 | ||
SK | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
RO | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
BE | 22.11.2006 | ||
CH | 22.11.2006 | ||
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
LI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 22.11.2006 | |
BG | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0643131 (COPAN ITALIA SPA [IT]) [AD] 1-10,13-18* figure 3; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9935483 (STAGO INTERNATIONAL [FR], et al) [A] 1-10,13-18 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0940180 (HESCH ROLF DIETER [DE]) [A] 1-10,13-18 * figure 1; claims 1,2 * |