EP1385112 - Decision support and work management for synchronizing learning services [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2006 | Refusal of application | published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accenture Global Services GmbH Herrenacker 15 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [2005/35] |
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states Accenture Global Services GmbH Geschäftshaus Herrenacker 15 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foley, Christopher P. 551 Melrose Avenue Kenilworth, IL 60043 / US | 02 /
Chuang, Kai 2395 W. Gold Dust Trail Highlands Ranch, CO 80129 / US | 03 /
Draper, William Christopher, Jr. 205 East 78th Street New York, NY 10021 / US | 04 /
Stovall, Thomas Kenneth 635 Denards Mill Marietta, GA 30067 / US | 05 /
Hubbell, John R. 1314 Rosalie Street Evanston, IL 60201 / US | [2004/05] | Representative(s) | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03076998.8 | 27.06.2003 | [2004/05] | Priority number, date | US20020391929P | 28.06.2002 Original published format: US 391929 P | US20020391932P | 28.06.2002 Original published format: US 391932 P | US20020398715P | 29.07.2002 Original published format: US 398715 P | US20020398926P | 29.07.2002 Original published format: US 398926 P | [2004/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1385112 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60, G09B7/00 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
G09B7/02 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G09B19/18 (EP,US);
G09B5/00 (EP,US);
G09B7/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/05] | Title | German: | Entscheidungshilfe und Arbeitsverwaltung zum Synchronisieren von Lerndiensten | [2004/05] | English: | Decision support and work management for synchronizing learning services | [2004/05] | French: | Aide pour décision et administration du travail pour la synchronisation du service d'apprentissage | [2004/05] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 09.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/39] | 10.05.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.05.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/39] | Divisional application(s) | EP06113001.9 / EP1703454 | Request for further processing for: | 06.06.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 06.06.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.06.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search |