EP1384742 - Cross-linkable compounds comprising a perfluoropolyether moiety [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Océ-Technologies B.V. St. Urbanusweg 43 5914 CC Venlo / NL | [2004/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cornelissen, Ronald H.C. Luchtvaartplein 36 5703 HJ Helmond / NL | 02 /
van Zeeventer, Karel P.D. Roomweg 17 5985 NR Grashoek / NL | 03 /
Markies, Peter R. Ericaplein 32 5971 GC Grubbenvorst / NL | 04 /
Verbeek, Guy P.M. Eikerstraat 78/7 3680 Maaseik / BE | 05 /
Verbunt, Joannes A. Heideweg 39 5941 AW Velden / NL | 06 /
De Jong, Sandra M. Harry Meijerstraat 127 5913 RG Venlo / NL | 07 /
Zeelen, Peter Maria Cornelis Zandberg 22 5993 AA Maasbree / NL | [2004/05] | Representative(s) | Janssen, Paulus J. P. Océ-Technologies B.V. Corporate Patents P.O. Box 101 5900 MA Venlo / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | Janssen, P.J.P. Océ-Technologies B.V, P.O. Box 101 5900 MA Venlo / NL | Application number, filing date | 03077271.9 | 17.07.2003 | [2004/05] | Priority number, date | EP20020078182 | 26.07.2002 Original published format: EP 02078182 | [2004/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1384742 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1384742 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/46, C09D183/12 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
C08L83/04 (EP);
C07F7/081 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L83/04, C08L83/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/05] | Title | German: | Vernetzbare Perfluorether-Einheiten enthaltende Verbindungen | [2004/05] | English: | Cross-linkable compounds comprising a perfluoropolyether moiety | [2004/05] | French: | Composés réticulable comprenant un fragment perfluoropolyéther | [2004/05] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 31.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.01.2010 | BE | 13.01.2010 | CY | 13.01.2010 | CZ | 13.01.2010 | DK | 13.01.2010 | EE | 13.01.2010 | FI | 13.01.2010 | IT | 13.01.2010 | RO | 13.01.2010 | SE | 13.01.2010 | SI | 13.01.2010 | SK | 13.01.2010 | TR | 13.01.2010 | BG | 13.04.2010 | GR | 14.04.2010 | ES | 24.04.2010 | PT | 13.05.2010 | HU | 14.07.2010 | IE | 17.07.2010 | LU | 17.07.2010 | CH | 31.07.2010 | LI | 31.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 13.01.2010 | |
BE | 13.01.2010 | ||
CY | 13.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2010 | ||
DK | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
IT | 13.01.2010 | ||
RO | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
BG | 13.04.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 24.04.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
HU | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 17.07.2010 | ||
LU | 17.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 13.01.2010 | |
BE | 13.01.2010 | ||
CY | 13.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2010 | ||
DK | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
IT | 13.01.2010 | ||
RO | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
BG | 13.04.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 24.04.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
HU | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 17.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 13.01.2010 | |
BE | 13.01.2010 | ||
CY | 13.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2010 | ||
DK | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
IT | 13.01.2010 | ||
RO | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
BG | 13.04.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 24.04.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
IE | 17.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 13.01.2010 | |
BE | 13.01.2010 | ||
CY | 13.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2010 | ||
DK | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
IT | 13.01.2010 | ||
RO | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
BG | 13.04.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 24.04.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 13.01.2010 | |
BE | 13.01.2010 | ||
CY | 13.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2010 | ||
DK | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
IT | 13.01.2010 | ||
RO | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
BG | 13.04.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 24.04.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 13.01.2010 | |
BE | 13.01.2010 | ||
CY | 13.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2010 | ||
DK | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
RO | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
BG | 13.04.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 24.04.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 13.01.2010 | |
BE | 13.01.2010 | ||
CY | 13.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2010 | ||
DK | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
RO | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
BG | 13.04.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 24.04.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 13.01.2010 | |
BE | 13.01.2010 | ||
CY | 13.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
RO | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
BG | 13.04.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 24.04.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 13.01.2010 | |
BE | 13.01.2010 | ||
CY | 13.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
RO | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 24.04.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 13.01.2010 | |
BE | 13.01.2010 | ||
CY | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
RO | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
ES | 24.04.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 13.01.2010 | |
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
ES | 24.04.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 13.01.2010 | |
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
ES | 24.04.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 13.01.2010 | |
ES | 24.04.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 13.01.2010 | |
ES | 24.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 13.01.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4440918 (RICE DAVID E [US], et al) [X] 1* column 3, line 49 - line 55 *; | [DX]US4565714 (KOSHAR ROBERT J [US]) [DX] 1,8,10 * column 7, line 1 * * column 9, line 60 - line 65 * * column 10, line 55 - line 58 *; | [X]US5026606 (ISBRANDT RUSSELL R [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * claim 1 * * column 5, line 26 - line 30 *; | [DX]EP0770634 (OCE NEDERLAND BV [NL]) [DX] 1 * page 2, line 45 - line 55 * |