EP1371639 - Monomers, ionomers and polymers for electrochemical uses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Farnham, William Brown 123 Dewberry Drive Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US | 02 /
Yang, Zhen-Yu 2609 Marhill Drive Wilmington, Delaware 19810 / US | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Cockerton, Bruce Roger, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Cockerton, Bruce Roger, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2003/51] | Cockerton, Bruce Roger, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03077445.9 | 26.10.1999 | [2004/17] | Priority number, date | US19980105662P | 26.10.1998 Original published format: US 105662 P | [2003/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1371639 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1371639 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07C309/81, C07C309/20, C08F28/02, H01M6/18 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
C07C309/20 (EP,US);
C07C309/81 (EP,KR);
C08F228/02 (EP);
C08F8/44 (EP);
H01G11/52 (EP);
H01M10/05 (EP);
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M10/0525 (EP);
H01M10/0565 (EP);
H01M10/0568 (EP);
H01M4/382 (EP);
H01M4/587 (EP);
H01M4/621 (EP);
H01M6/181 (EP);
H01M8/1023 (EP);
H01M8/1039 (EP);
C08F216/1475 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/131 (EP);
H01M4/133 (EP);
H01M4/485 (EP);
H01M4/505 (EP);
H01M4/525 (EP);
H01M4/8605 (EP);
H01M6/22 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/51] | Title | German: | Monomere, Ionomere und Polymere für Elektrochemische Anwendungen | [2003/51] | English: | Monomers, ionomers and polymers for electrochemical uses | [2003/51] | French: | Monomères, ionomères et polymères destinés à des utilisations électrochimiques | [2003/51] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 06.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/13] | 25.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/13] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99958673.8 / EP1124796 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4275225 (KRESPAN CARL G) [AD] 1,2 * utility examples C, Q *; | [AD]WO9820573 (DU PONT [US]) [AD] 1,2* comparative example 1; example 41 * |