EP1393873 - Composite spar drape forming machine and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | ||
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states The Boeing Company P.O. Box 3707, M.S. 11-XT Seattle, Washington 98124-2207 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Willden, Kurtis S. c/o P.O. 3707, M.S. 11-XT Seattle, Washington 98124-2207 / US | 02 /
Henderson, Raymond N. 2045 S, 332 St. Fereral Way, Washington 98003 / US | 03 /
Pfitzner, Gary E. c/o P.O. 3707, M.S. 11-XT Seattle, Washington 98124-2207 / US | 04 /
Parekh, Surenda R. c/o P.O. 3707, M.S. 11-XT Seattle, Washington 98124-2207 / US | 05 /
Harris, Christopher G. c/o P.O. 3707, M.S. 11-XT Seattle, Washington 98124-2207 / US | [2004/10] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/26] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2004/10] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 03077556.3 | 14.08.2003 | [2004/10] | Priority number, date | US20020233269 | 30.08.2002 Original published format: US 233269 | [2004/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1393873 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1393873 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | [2007/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1393873 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B29C33/30, B29C70/34, B29C70/54 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
B29C70/342 (EP,US);
B29C70/541 (EP,US);
B29C33/307 (EP,US);
B29C51/087 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/10] | B29C33/30, B29C70/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/10] | Title | German: | Maschine und Verfahren zum Bilden eines Holms aus Verbundwerkstoff durch Drapieren | [2011/24] | English: | Composite spar drape forming machine and method | [2004/10] | French: | Machine et procédé de mise en forme d'un longeron composite par drapage | [2004/10] |
Former [2004/10] | Maschine und Verfahren zum Formen eines faserverstärkten Holms durch Drapieren | Examination procedure | 22.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 02.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.06.2011 | BE | 22.06.2011 | CY | 22.06.2011 | CZ | 22.06.2011 | DK | 22.06.2011 | EE | 22.06.2011 | FI | 22.06.2011 | HU | 22.06.2011 | NL | 22.06.2011 | RO | 22.06.2011 | SE | 22.06.2011 | SI | 22.06.2011 | SK | 22.06.2011 | TR | 22.06.2011 | IE | 14.08.2011 | LU | 14.08.2011 | CH | 31.08.2011 | LI | 31.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | BG | 22.09.2011 | GR | 23.09.2011 | PT | 24.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
TR | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 14.08.2011 | ||
LU | 14.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 14.08.2011 | ||
LU | 14.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 14.08.2011 | ||
LU | 14.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
IE | 14.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4475976 (MITTELSTADT ROBERT F [US], et al) [A] 1-48 * abstract *; | [A]US4980013 (LOWERY PATRICK A [US]) [A] 1-48 * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 23; figure 1 * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 24; figures 7,8 * * column 4, line 25 - line 28 * * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 23; figures 11,12 *; | [A]US5076873 (LOWERY PATRICK A [US]) [A] 35-37 * column 3, line 29 - line 55; figures 1,7 *; | [X]EP0577505 (SNECMA [FR]) [X] 21,47,48 * column 6, line 53 - column 7, line 9; figures 1,2 * * column 7, line 22 - column 8, line 11; figures 3a-3d *; | [X]WO9606725 (BOEING CO [US]) [X] 21-23,25,27,40 * page 7, line 23 - page 8, line 14; figures 2,7 * * page 9, line 12 - line 19; figure 3 * * figures 10,11 *; | [XA]US5902535 (BURGESS ROGER [US], et al) [X] 11 * column 3, line 14 - line 41; figures 1-3 * [A] 46; | [A]US5954917 (JACKSON DANA B [US], et al) [A] 35-37 * column 4, line 26 - line 38; figures 3a,3b * * column 8, line 12 - line 15 * * column 8, line 45 - line 59; figure 14 *; | [X]EP1044790 (PLASTIC OMNIUM CIE [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,13,15-17 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0065]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0075]; figures 2-4 * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0078]; figure 6 * * paragraph [0079]; figure 7 * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0088] *; | [A] - STEGMANN C, "LAY-UP MADE EASIER THANKS TO LASER PROJECTION", REINFORCED PLASTICS, ELSEVIER ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19940501), vol. 38, no. 5, ISSN 0034-3617, page 17, XP000451922 [A] 1-48 * page 17 * | by applicant | WO9606725 |