EP1365340 - An information management system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orchestria Limited 190 The Strand London WC2R 1JN / GB | [2003/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Malcolm, Peter Bryan Wortham Lewdown Okehampton Devon EX20 4QJ / GB | 02 /
Napier, John Anthony Little Stamborough Roadwater Watchet Somerset TA23 ORW / GB | 03 /
Stickler, Andrew Mark Parsonage Farmhouse Netherclay Bishop's Hull Taunton Somerset TA1 5EE / GB | 04 /
Tamblin, Nathan John 5 Oakfield Park Wellington Somerset TA21 8EX / GB | 05 /
Beadle, Paul James Owen Waterside House Uplowman Tiverton Devon EX16 7DW / GB | 06 /
Crocker, Jason Paul 4 Harvey Way Ashill Ilminster Somerset TA19 9QD / GB | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | Reeve, Nicholas Edward Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/51] | Reeve, Nicholas Edward Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2003/48] | Abnett, Richard Charles REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03077588.6 | 08.11.2001 | [2003/48] | Priority number, date | GB20000027280 | 08.11.2000 Original published format: GB 0027280 | US20010923704 | 07.08.2001 Original published format: US 923704 | [2003/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1365340 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1365340 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | [2003/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1365340 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G06F21/606 (EP,US);
G06F21/6218 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06Q10/063 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3674 (EP,US);
G06Q20/382 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3821 (EP,US);
G06Q20/401 (EP,US);
G06Q20/4012 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
H04L51/214 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/48] | G06F17/60 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/48] | Title | German: | Ein Informationsverwaltungssystem | [2003/48] | English: | An information management system | [2003/48] | French: | Un système de gestion d' informations | [2003/48] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 30.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.03.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01980761.9 / EP1360623 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.01.2008 | BE | 09.01.2008 | CY | 09.01.2008 | FI | 09.01.2008 | TR | 09.01.2008 | GR | 10.04.2008 | PT | 09.06.2008 | [2010/48] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
TR | 09.01.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
FI | 09.01.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0736827 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-69 * abstract * * column 3, line 10 - line 25 * * column 7, line 9 - line 50 * * column 8, line 52 - column 9, line 26 * * figure 4 *; | [X] - BOONE G, "CONCEPT FEATURES IN RE:AGENT, AN INTELLIGENT EMAIL AGENT", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2ND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON AUTONOMOUS AGENTS MINNEAPOLIS/ST.PAUL, MN, MAY 9 - 13, 1998, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON AUTONOMOUS AGENTS, NEW YORK, NY: ACM, US, (19980509), ISBN 0-89791-983-1, pages 141 - 148, XP000887407 [X] 1-69 * page 141, column L - page 142, column L * * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/280765.280791 | [X] - MARSHALL D. ABRAMS; JONATHAN D. MOFETT, "A higher level of computer security through active policies", ELSEVIER SCIENCE DIRECT, vol. 14, no. 2, (1995), pages 147 - 157, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com/science?_ob=ArticleURL&_udi=B6V8G-3Y45TGV-58&_user=987766&_coverDate=12%2F31%2F1995&_alid=118293920&_rdoc=10&_fmt=summary&_orig=search&_cdi=5870&_sort=d&_st=4&_docanchor=&_acct=C000049880&_version=1&_urlVersion=0&_userid=987766&md5=4804cadc20cf4ca465d14e1802c023d7, (20031003), XP002257284 [X] 1-69 * page 147 - page 156 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-4048(95)97048-F | [Y] - TAKKINEN J ET AL, "CAFE: A CONCEPTUAL MODEL FOR MANAGING INFORMATION IN ELECTRONIC MAIL", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL HAWAII INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SYSTEM SCIENCES, XX, XX, (1998), pages 44 - 53, XP000775829 [Y] 1-69 * page 47, column L * | [Y] - HURWITZ GROUP, "Managing Exchange 2000 Migration with BindView", WWW.HURWITZ.COM, (200010), pages 1 - 15, URL: http://www.bindview.com/resources/WhitePapers/hurwitz_bindview_exchange2000.pdf, (20031003), XP002257285 [Y] 1-69 * page 1 - page 2 * | [Y] - STEPHEN SATCHELL, "Keeping e-mail secure", IBM DEVELOPERWORKS, (20001001), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://www-106.ibm.com/developerworks/library/s-email.html?open&loc=dw-s, (20031002), XP002257287 [Y] 1-69 * page 1 - page 3 * | [Y] - MIKE SCHLOSSER, "IBM Application Framework for e-business: Security", IBM DEVELOPERWORKS, (199911), pages 1 - 8, URL: ftp://www6.software.ibm.com/software/developer/library/security.pdf, (20031003), XP002257288 [Y] 1-69 * page 1 - page 7 * | Examination | US5917489 | US6073142 |