EP1513202 - Detector for electromagnetic radiation assisted by majority current [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VRIJE UNIVERSITEIT BRUSSEL Pleinlaan 2 1050 Brussel / BE | [2010/03] |
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states VRIJE UNIVERSITEIT BRUSSEL Pleinlaan 2 1050 Brussel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuijk, Maarten Vredestraat 154 2600 Berchem-Antwerpen / BE | 02 /
Van Nieuwenhove, Daniel Heymansstraat 17 1981 Hofstade / BE | [2005/10] | Representative(s) | Bird, William Edward, et al Bird Goën & Co Wetenschapspark Arenberg Gaston Geenslaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | Bird, William Edward, et al Bird Goen & Co., Klein Dalenstraat 42A 3020 Winksele / BE | Application number, filing date | 03077744.5 | 02.09.2003 | [2005/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1513202 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1513202 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0352, G01J1/42 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
H01L31/0352 (EP,US);
G01S7/4816 (EP,US);
G01S7/4913 (EP,US);
H01L31/101 (EP,US);
G01S17/894 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/10] | Title | German: | Ein durch einen Strom aus Majoritätsträgern unterstützter Detektor für elektromagnetische Strahlung | [2005/10] | English: | Detector for electromagnetic radiation assisted by majority current | [2005/10] | French: | Détecteur de rayonnement électromagnétique assisté par un courant de porteurs majoritaires | [2005/10] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 22.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08167724.7 / EP2023399 | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.01.2010 | CY | 20.01.2010 | CZ | 20.01.2010 | EE | 20.01.2010 | RO | 20.01.2010 | SI | 20.01.2010 | SK | 20.01.2010 | BG | 20.04.2010 | GR | 21.04.2010 | PT | 20.05.2010 | HU | 21.07.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | [2012/42] |
Former [2011/19] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 20.01.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0883187 (IMEC INTER UNI MICRO ELECTR [BE]) [A] 1-19 * figure 1 * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO0233817 (SCHWARTE RUDOLF [DE]) [A] 1-19* figure 6 *; | [A]US2002140045 (LAUTER JOSEF [DE], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] , [0031] , [0039] * * figures 1,2 * |