EP1435481 - Gas tank with protection system for underground installation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Poillucci, Giovanni Viale Alcione, 176 66023 Francavilla al Mare (Chieti) / IT | [2004/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/28] | Representative(s) | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via della Quattro Fontane 15 00184 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | Siniscalco, Fabio, et al JACOBACCI & PARTNERS S.p.A. Via delle Quattro Fontane, 15 00184 Roma / IT | ||
Former [2004/28] | Maggioni, Claudio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A., Via delle Quattro Fontane 15 I-00184 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 03078057.1 | 26.09.2003 | [2004/28] | Priority number, date | EP20020425656 | 30.10.2002 Original published format: EP 02425656 | [2004/28] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1435481 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1435481 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F17C1/00 | [2004/28] | CPC: |
F17C1/007 (EP);
F17C2201/0109 (EP);
F17C2201/032 (EP);
F17C2201/035 (EP);
F17C2201/054 (EP);
F17C2203/0304 (EP);
F17C2203/0337 (EP);
F17C2203/0607 (EP);
F17C2203/0629 (EP);
F17C2203/0639 (EP);
F17C2203/066 (EP);
F17C2205/018 (EP);
F17C2205/0188 (EP);
F17C2205/0308 (EP);
F17C2205/0323 (EP);
F17C2205/0332 (EP);
F17C2205/0394 (EP);
F17C2209/221 (EP);
F17C2209/228 (EP);
F17C2209/238 (EP);
F17C2221/035 (EP);
F17C2223/0153 (EP);
F17C2223/033 (EP);
F17C2250/036 (EP);
F17C2250/0408 (EP);
F17C2250/0443 (EP);
F17C2260/015 (EP);
F17C2260/037 (EP);
F17C2260/044 (EP);
F17C2260/053 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/28] | Title | German: | Schutzvorrichtung für in die Erde versenkbare Flüssiggasbehälter | [2004/28] | English: | Gas tank with protection system for underground installation | [2004/28] | French: | Installation de protection pour citernes de gaz liquéfié destinées à être enterrées | [2004/28] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 10.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05106252.9 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 09.08.2005 | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.02.2006 | BE | 01.02.2006 | CH | 01.02.2006 | CY | 01.02.2006 | CZ | 01.02.2006 | EE | 01.02.2006 | FI | 01.02.2006 | FR | 01.02.2006 | LI | 01.02.2006 | NL | 01.02.2006 | SK | 01.02.2006 | DK | 01.05.2006 | SE | 01.05.2006 | DE | 03.05.2006 | HU | 02.08.2006 | IE | 26.09.2006 | LU | 26.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2006 | ||
EE | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
DE | 03.05.2006 | ||
HU | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 26.09.2006 | ||
LU | 26.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2006 | ||
EE | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
DE | 03.05.2006 | ||
HU | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 26.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2006 | ||
EE | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
DE | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 26.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
DE | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 26.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
DE | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 26.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
IT | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
DE | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 26.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
IT | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
DE | 03.05.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
DE | 03.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
BE | 01.02.2006 | ||
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SK | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
CH | 01.02.2006 | ||
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
LI | 01.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 01.02.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR748880 (BASSET JAMES) [A] 1-14 * page 1, lines 25-32 *; | [Y]AT231903B (BP BENZIN UND PETROLEUM AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-13,17,21-26 * page 1, lines 1-8 *; | [A]DE1812859 (ROHMER RICHARD HEATH) [A] 1-14 * page 2, paragraph 3; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0565444 (LEFLAIVE ETIENNE [FR], et al) [Y] 3 * column 3, lines 41-48 * * column 5, lines 42-48 * * column 6, lines 7-16 *; | [A]EP0752555 (TOSTO WALTER SERBATOI SPA [IT]) [A] 1-14* figure 1; claims 1-6 *; | [A]BE1013583 (J REMACLE ETS [BE]) [A] 1-14 * page 1, line 18; claims 1-10 *; | [Y] - "UNE NOUVELLE GENERATION DE CITERNES ENTERREES A NEW GENERATION OF BURIED TANKS", PETROLE INFORMATIONS, SOCIDOC-BIP. PARIS, FR, (19931001), no. 29, ISSN 0150-6463, pages 15 - 17, XP000403867 [Y] 1-13,17,21-26 * column 5, paragraph 3 * * column 6, paragraphs 1-3 * |