EP1418507 - Method and system for multiple cue integration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2006 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sun, Zhaohui c/o Eastman Kodak Company, P.L.S. 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 03078299.9 | 20.10.2003 | [2004/20] | Priority number, date | US20020285171 | 31.10.2002 Original published format: US 285171 | [2004/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1418507 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1418507 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00, G06F17/30, G06K9/62 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
G06F16/5838 (EP,US);
G06F18/2323 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/20] | G06F17/18, G06F17/30 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/38] |
Former [2004/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Methode und System zur Integration mehrerer Merkmale | [2004/20] | English: | Method and system for multiple cue integration | [2004/20] | French: | Procéde et système d'integration de plusieurs charactéristiques | [2004/20] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/26] | 16.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.08.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.08.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 05.08.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXY] - MEILA M ET AL., "Learning Segmentation by Random Walks", PROC. CONF. ON NEURAL INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEMS, (2000), pages 873 - 879, XP002300377 [DX] 1-10 * the whole document * [Y] 11,12 | [Y] - LOUI A C ET AL, "Automatic image event segmentation and quality screening for albuming applications", MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO, 2000. ICME 2000. 2000 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON NEW YORK, NY, USA 30 JULY-2 AUG. 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (20000730), ISBN 0-7803-6536-4, pages 1125 - 1128, XP010513207 [Y] 11,12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICME.2000.871558 | [DA] - GDALYAHU Y ET AL, "SELF-ORGANIZATION IN VISION: STOCHASTIC CLUSTERING FOR IMAGE SEGMENTATION, PERCEPTUAL GROUPING, AND IMAGE DATABASE ORGANIZATION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (200110), vol. 23, no. 10, ISSN 0162-8828, pages 1053 - 1074, XP001132545 [DA] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.954598 | [A] - MALIK J ET AL, "Contour and texture analysis for image segmentation", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF COMPUTER VISION KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS NETHERLANDS, (2001), vol. 43, no. 1, ISSN 0920-5691, pages 7 - 27, XP009039552 [A] * page 20, column R - page 25, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1011174803800 |