EP1427220 - Projection display apparatus having both incoherent and laser light sources [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kowarz, Marek W., Eastman Kodak company Patent Legal Staff 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650-2201 / US | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas, et al Kodak Industrie, Département Brevets, CRT, Zone Industrielle 71102 Chalon sur Saône Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 03078440.9 | 03.11.2003 | [2004/24] | Priority number, date | US20020425896P | 13.11.2002 Original published format: US 425896 P | US20030395678 | 24.03.2003 Original published format: US 395678 | [2004/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1427220 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/31 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
H04N9/3164 (EP,US);
H04N9/3105 (EP,US);
H04N9/3132 (EP,US);
H04N9/3161 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2005/09] |
Former [2004/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Projektionsanzeigegerät mit Laser- und inkohärenten Lichtquellen | [2004/24] | English: | Projection display apparatus having both incoherent and laser light sources | [2004/24] | French: | Appareil d'affichage par projection utilisant des sources lumineuses incohérentes et laser | [2004/24] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 12.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/37] | 28.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5526063 (JOUBERT CECILE [FR], et al) [A] 1-13* column 4, line 56 - column 6, line 46 *; | [Y]US6323984 (TRISNADI JAHJA I [US]) [Y] 1,2,4,7-11 * column 3, line 47 - column 6, line 26 *; | [Y]US2002067468 (O'CONNOR MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 1,2,4,7-11 * the whole document * |