EP1416589 - Electronic interconnect device for high speed signal and data transmission, and adapter usable therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tektronix Inc. 14200 S.W. Karl Braun Drive P.O.Box 500 Beaverton Oregon 97077-0001 / US | [2006/17] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Tektronix Inc. 14200 S.W. Karl Braun Drive P.O.Box 500 Beaverton Oregon 97077-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pooley, William R. 5445 SW 190th Aloha, Oregon 97007 / US | 02 /
Ayres, Daniel J. 58341 S. Bachelor Flat Road Warren, Oregon 97053 / US | 03 /
Swafford, M. David 23375 NE Ridge Road Gaston, Oregon 97119 / US | 04 /
Law, William Q. 6465 SW 204th Place Beaverton, Oregon 97007 / US | 05 /
Kyle, Michael L. 1180 NW 122nd Avenue Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | 06 /
Lyford, J. Steven 390 NW Brynwood Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | 07 /
Myers, Jonathan E. 928 SE 33rd Portland, Oregon 97214 / US | 08 /
Nightingale, Mark W. 719-20th Street Washougal, Washington 98671 / US | 09 /
Shane, Jerry R. 17970 NW Andria Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03078624.8 | 20.03.2001 | [2004/19] | Priority number, date | US20000193622P | 31.03.2000 Original published format: US 193622 P | [2004/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1416589 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1416589 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/05, H01R13/187 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
H01R13/187 (EP);
H01R9/0515 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/19] | Title | German: | Signalübertragungssystem für Hochgeschwindigkeitsdatenübertragung sowie ein hierfür geeigneter Adapter | [2004/19] | English: | Electronic interconnect device for high speed signal and data transmission, and adapter usable therewith | [2004/19] | French: | Système de transfert de signaux pour le transfert de données à grande vitesse, et adapteur à utiliser avec ledit système | [2004/19] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/48] | 11.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01302543.2 / EP1139497 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.06.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/40] | IT | 26.04.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4245875 (SHAFFER HOWARD R, et al) [A] 1-19* column 3, line 44 - line 51 *; | [A]US4426127 (KUBOTA JAMES [US]) [A] 1-19 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5234353 (SCHOLZ JAMES P [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 7, line 51 - line 68 *; | [A]US5857866 (FELPS JIMMIE D [US]) [A] 1-19 * column 6, line 54 - line 58 * |