EP1406280 - Electromagnetic relay with solder flux penetration preventing structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2006 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.10.2006 [2006/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takamisawa Electric Co., Ltd. 3-5 Higashi-Gotanda 2-Chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0022 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states Takamisawa Electric Co., Ltd. 3-5 Higashi-Gotanda 2-Chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0022 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshino, Kosei 1173-778 Kusagoe Miyota-machi Kita-Saku-gun Nagano / JP | 02 /
Nakabayashi, Takahiro 1979-283, Kawaguchi, Kawaguchi-machi Kitauonuma-gun, Niigata 949-7504 / JP | 03 /
Takano, Satoshi Isebayashi Danchi A4-305 1896-1 Arakoda Saku-shi Nagano / JP | 04 /
Takahata, Masaki 682-13 Kashiwagi-Uehara Komoro-shi Nagano / JP | [2004/28] |
Former [2004/15] | 01 /
Yoshino, Kosei 1173-778 Kusagoe Miyota-machi Kita-Saku-gun Nagano / JP | ||
02 /
Nakabayashi, Takahiro Riverstone 201 3284-5 Nakagomi Saku-shi Nagano / JP | |||
03 /
Takano, Satoshi Isebayashi Danchi A4-305 1896-1 Arakoda Saku-shi Nagano / JP | |||
04 /
Takahata, Masaki 682-13 Kashiwagi-Uehara Komoro-shi Nagano / JP | Representative(s) | Valentine, Francis Anthony Brinsley, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | Valentine, Francis Anthony Brinsley, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03078858.2 | 18.03.1998 | [2004/15] | Priority number, date | JP19970261143 | 10.09.1997 Original published format: JP 26114397 | JP19970281164 | 30.09.1997 Original published format: JP 28116497 | JP19970281164 | 13.09.1997 Original published format: JP 28116497 | [2005/43] |
Former [2005/34] | JP19970261143 | 10.09.1997 | |
JP19970281164 | 13.09.1997 | ||
Former [2004/15] | JP19970261143 | 10.09.1997 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1406280 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1406280 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01H50/44, H01H50/02 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
H01H50/023 (EP,US);
H01H50/28 (EP,US);
H01H2050/446 (EP,US);
H01H50/041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2005/01] |
Former [2004/15] | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Elektromagnetisches Relais mit einer Anordnung zum Verhindern des Eindringens von Lotflussmittel | [2004/15] | English: | Electromagnetic relay with solder flux penetration preventing structure | [2004/15] | French: | Relais électromagnétique avec une structure pour prévenir la pénétration du flux à souder | [2004/15] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 27.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98302042.1 / EP0902452 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04145608 ; | [A]DE1919729 (RAU SWF AUTOZUBEHOER) [A] 1-3 * page 3, line 9 - line 18 * * page 4, line 17 - line 34 * * figures 3,4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920904), vol. 016, no. 420, Database accession no. (E - 1259), & JP04145608 A 19920519 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract * |