EP1334803 - Clamping device, in particular a vice [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILMA-RÖMHELD GmbH Schützenstrasse 74 57271 Hilchenbach / DE | [2003/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hippenstiel, Reiner Birkenweg 6 57080, Siegen / DE | [2003/33] | Representative(s) | von Ahsen, Erwin-Detlef, et al Von Ahsen, Nachtwey & Kollegen Anwaltskanzlei Wilhelm-Herbst-Strasse 5 28359 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/33] | von Ahsen, Erwin-Detlef, Dipl.-Ing., et al von Ahsen, Nachtwey & Kollegen Postfach 10 77 40 28077 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03100266.0 | 10.02.2003 | [2003/33] | Priority number, date | DE2002105601 | 11.02.2002 Original published format: DE 10205601 | [2003/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1334803 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1334803 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1334803 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B25B1/24 | [2003/33] | CPC: |
B25B1/2405 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/33] | Title | German: | Spannvorrichtung, insbesondere Schraubstock | [2003/33] | English: | Clamping device, in particular a vice | [2003/33] | French: | Dispositif de serrage, notamment étau | [2003/33] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 25.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.08.2008 | CZ | 06.08.2008 | DK | 06.08.2008 | EE | 06.08.2008 | FI | 06.08.2008 | IE | 06.08.2008 | NL | 06.08.2008 | SI | 06.08.2008 | SK | 06.08.2008 | TR | 06.08.2008 | BG | 06.11.2008 | SE | 06.11.2008 | GR | 07.11.2008 | ES | 17.11.2008 | PT | 06.01.2009 | HU | 07.02.2009 | LU | 10.02.2009 | BE | 28.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
GR | 07.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
HU | 07.02.2009 | ||
LU | 10.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
GR | 07.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
LU | 10.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
GR | 07.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 06.08.2008 | |
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 06.08.2008 | |
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | FI | 06.08.2008 | |
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 06.08.2008 | |
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
ES | 17.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | NL | 06.08.2008 | |
ES | 17.11.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE245968 (IRING) [A] 1,5-8,10 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2490843 (ILIO SORDI) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 16 - line 28 *; | [A]US2680395 (CHRISTIANSEN ERWOOD B); | [Y]US3874578 (DERR CHESTER B, et al) [Y] 5 * figures 1,2 *; | [XA]US4191367 (SHETEROM SAMUEL G JR [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,10 * column 3, line 39 - line 62 * * column 8, line 26 - line 61; figures 7,8 * [A] 3; | [XAY]GB2218029 (COOK STANLEY ERIC) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3,4 [Y] 5; | [A]US5060920 (ENGIBAROV EDDY [US]) [A] 1 * figures 2,3,5 * |