EP1464830 - Method for controlling an engine before and after engine stillstand [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, Inc., A subsidiary of Ford Motor Company 600 Parklane Towers East Dearborn Michigan 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, Inc., A subsidiary of Ford Motor Company 600 Parklane Towers East Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grieser, Klemens Heiderhoefchen 31 40764, Langenfeld / DE | 02 /
Kramer, Ulrich Rosenstr. 18 51427, Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 03 /
Phlips, Patrick Joseph Vogelsanger Weg 12 50858, Koeln / DE | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Drömer, Hans-Carsten, et al Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung NH/DRP Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | Drömer, Hans-Carsten, Dr.-Ing., et al Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung NH/DRP, Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 03100840.2 | 31.03.2003 | [2004/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1464830 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02N17/00, F02N17/08, F02D41/06, F02D13/02 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
F02D13/0215 (EP);
F02D41/042 (EP);
F02D41/062 (EP);
F02N19/004 (EP);
F02N99/006 (EP);
F02D2041/389 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung einer Brennkraftmaschine vor und nach einem Motorstillstand | [2004/41] | English: | Method for controlling an engine before and after engine stillstand | [2004/41] | French: | Méthode de commande d'un moteur avant et après son arrêt | [2004/41] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH1018820 ; | [A]JP2002039038 ; | [X]DE19808472 (LSP INNOVATIVE AUTOMOTIVE SYS [DE], et al) [X] 1,11 * abstract * * claim - *; | [XY]EP1138937 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3-6,11 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0043] * * figures 20-22 * [Y] 7-10; | [DX]DE10020104 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DX] 1,11 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0033] *; | [DX]DE10020325 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DX] 1-6,11 * paragraph [0048] * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]GB2367859 (LOTUS CAR [GB]) [A] 1-11* the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 1998, no. 05, & JP10018820 A 19980120 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 7-10 * abstract * * figure 7 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020604), vol. 2002, no. 06, & JP2002039038 A 20020206 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19955857 | DE10020104 | DE10020325 |