EP1359104 - Method and apparatus for buffer transfer of media sheets between components in an imaging system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGFA CORPORATION 100 Challenger Road Ridgefield Park, NJ 07660-2199 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states Agfa Corporation 100 Challenger Road Ridgefield Park, NJ 07660-2199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAWES, Richard 10 Passaconaway Drive Billerica MA MA 01821 / US | [2003/45] | Representative(s) | Van Ostaeyen, Marc Albert Jozef, et al AGFA-GEVAERT Corporate IP Department 3800, Patent Administration, Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | Van Ostaeyen, Marc Albert Jozef, et al Agfa-Gevaert Corporate IP Department, Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | Application number, filing date | 03101167.9 | 29.04.2003 | [2003/45] | Priority number, date | US20020136833 | 02.05.2002 Original published format: US 136833 | [2003/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1359104 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Classification | IPC: | B65H29/00 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
B65H75/28 (EP,US);
B65H29/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Pufferübertragung von Blättern zwischen Komponenten in einem Bildaufzeichnungssystem | [2003/45] | English: | Method and apparatus for buffer transfer of media sheets between components in an imaging system | [2003/45] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de transfert tampon de feuilles entre des composants dans un système d'enregistrements d'images | [2003/45] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |