EP1477654 - Method to stop an internal combustion engine at a desired stand-by position [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC, A subsidary of Ford Motor Company 600 Parklane Towers East Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [2006/01] |
Former [2004/47] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC, A subsidary of Ford Motor Company 600 Parklane Towers East Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grieser, Klemens Heiderhoefchen 31 40764, Langenfeld / DE | 02 /
Kramer, Ulrich Rosenstr. 18 51427, Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 03 /
Badke, Klaus Stormstr. 8 50670, Koeln / DE | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | Drömer, Hans-Carsten, et al Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung NH/DRP Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/47] | Drömer, Hans-Carsten, Dr.-Ing., et al Ford-Werke Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung NH/DRP, Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 03101379.0 | 16.05.2003 | [2004/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1477654 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1477654 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/04, F02N11/08 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
F02N99/006 (EP);
F02D41/042 (EP);
F02D2041/0095 (EP);
F02N11/0814 (EP);
F02N19/005 (EP);
F02N2019/008 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/31] |
Former [2004/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Anhalten einer Brennkraftmaschine in einer gewuenschten Ruheposition | [2004/47] | English: | Method to stop an internal combustion engine at a desired stand-by position | [2004/47] | French: | Procede pour stopper un moteur a combustion interne entre une position de repos desirée | [2004/47] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 22.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0709563 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4* column 6, line 52 - column 7, line 6 *; | [Y]EP1113169 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 3,4 * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] *; | [XY]DE10030001 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,8 * column 1, line 50 - line 57 * * column 2, line 2 * * column 2, line 5 - line 19 * * column 4, line 33 - line 30 * [Y] 3,4 |