EP1369987 - H-bridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.01.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2003/50] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Komaromi, Patrick Nibelungengasse 1 1010 Wien / AT | 02 /
Svobodnik, Gregor Kagraner Anger 22/7/4 1220 Wien / AT | [2003/50] | Application number, filing date | 03101411.1 | 19.05.2003 | [2003/50] | Priority number, date | DE20021024244 | 29.05.2002 Original published format: DE 10224244 | [2003/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1369987 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1369987 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02P7/00 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
H02P7/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2005/04] |
Former [2003/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vollbrückenschaltung | [2003/50] | English: | H-bridge | [2003/50] | French: | Pont en H | [2003/50] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 24.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/24] | 09.02.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.12.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 13.12.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.12.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001097184 ; | [A]JPS6055888 ; | [A]EP0038214 (TECHNICAL OPERATIONS LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 4, paragraph L; figure 1 *; | [A]US4328451 (BARGE JEAN A) [A] 1 * column A * * column 2, lines 28-68 ** column 7, line 4 - column 8, line 4; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5559375 (JO HYUN M [KR], et al) [A] 1 * column A * * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 6; figures 1,2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010803), vol. 2000, no. 21, & JP2001097184 A 20010410 (TAKATA CORP) [A] 1 * column A; figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850806), vol. 9, no. 189, Database accession no. (E - 333), & JP60055888 A 19850401 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * column A; figures 2,3 * | Examination | DE19944964 | by applicant | US4328451 | US5559375 | JP2001097184 |