EP1371511 - A Method and System for a vehicle weatherstrip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Fairlane Plaza South Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Fairlane Plaza South Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn, MI 48126 / US | ||
Former [2006/20] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC. Fairlane Plaza South Suite 800 330 Town Center Drive Dearborn MI 48126 / US | ||
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, LLC Suite 600, Parklane Towers East, One Parklane Boulevard Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gearhart, Chris, Conway 21390, Waterloo road 48118, Chelsea / US | 02 /
Subramaniam, Sankaran 46724, Registry Drive 352 48187, Canton / US | 03 /
Kiridena, Vijitha, Senaka 2822, Chaseway Drive 48105, Ann Arbor / US | [2003/51] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. Ltd., 43-45 High Road Bushey Heath, Bushey, Herts WD23 1EE / GB | Application number, filing date | 03101614.0 | 03.06.2003 | [2003/51] | Priority number, date | US20020064130 | 13.06.2002 Original published format: US 64130 | [2003/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1371511 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1371511 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60J10/08, G01M13/00, E06B7/00, B60J10/00 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
B60J10/00 (EP,US);
B60J10/45 (EP,US);
B60J10/80 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24793 (EP,US);
Y10T428/28 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2848 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [2004/37] |
Former [2003/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ein Verfahren und System für eine Fahrzeugdichtung | [2003/51] | English: | A Method and System for a vehicle weatherstrip | [2003/51] | French: | Une méthode et système pour un joint d'étanchéité de véhicule | [2003/51] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 04.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 03.06.2009 | SE | 04.06.2009 | [2011/31] |
Former [2010/25] | GB | 03.06.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5046285 (FRATINI JR ALBERT V [US], et al) [A] 1,7,9,10 * column 1, line 15 - column 2, line 61; figures 1-8; claims 1,6 *; | [A]US5253453 (MAASS KLAUS P [DE], et al) [A] 1,7,9,10 * figures 1-8; claims 1,11 *; | [A]GB2272299 (DRAFTEX IND LTD [GB]) [A] 1,7,9,10 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 2, paragraph 1; claims 1,9 *; | [A]EP0822109 (DRAFTEX IND LTD [GB]) |