EP1382237 - Feed conveyor/rock trap and header drive for an agricultural harvesting machine. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CNH Industrial Belgium nv Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [2014/13] |
Former [2004/04] | For all designated states CNH Belgium N.V. Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schroeder, Jay D. 355 Schroeder Road 61240, Coal Valley / US | 02 /
Guske, William C. 11 Woodcrest Drive 61254, Geneseo / US | [2004/04] | Representative(s) | CNH Industrial IP Department CNH Belgium NV Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [2015/33] |
Former [2010/21] | CNH IP Department CNH Belgium NV Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | ||
Former [2004/04] | Vandenbroucke, Alberic, et al CNH Belgium N.V. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 03102044.9 | 08.07.2003 | [2004/04] | Priority number, date | US20020196011 | 16.07.2002 Original published format: US 196011 | [2004/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1382237 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1382237 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01D69/00, A01F29/14 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
A01D69/00 (EP,US);
A01D41/142 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/33] |
Former [2004/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zufuhrförderer/Steinfangvorrichtung sowie Schneidwerksantrieb für eine landwirtschaftliche Erntemaschine | [2004/04] | English: | Feed conveyor/rock trap and header drive for an agricultural harvesting machine. | [2004/04] | French: | Convoyeur d'alimentation/trappe à cailloux et dispositif d'entraînement pour une tête de coupe d'une moissonneuse-batteuse | [2004/04] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.07.2003 | AT | 12.08.2015 | BG | 12.08.2015 | CY | 12.08.2015 | CZ | 12.08.2015 | DK | 12.08.2015 | EE | 12.08.2015 | ES | 12.08.2015 | FI | 12.08.2015 | MC | 12.08.2015 | NL | 12.08.2015 | RO | 12.08.2015 | SE | 12.08.2015 | SI | 12.08.2015 | SK | 12.08.2015 | TR | 12.08.2015 | GR | 13.11.2015 | PT | 14.12.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 08.07.2003 | |
AT | 12.08.2015 | ||
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
TR | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 08.07.2003 | |
AT | 12.08.2015 | ||
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 12.08.2015 | |
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 12.08.2015 | |
GR | 13.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4009556 (MOLZAHN HERBERT W) [A] 1-13* figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0680687 (FORD NEW HOLLAND NV [BE]) [A] 1-13 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 11 * * column 6, lines 18-45; figures 1,5 *; | [XA]EP1151660 (KRONE BERNHARD GMBH MASCHF [DE]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 47 - column 4, line 14; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-13; | [XA]EP1180322 (MALPAS TRACTORS WREXHAM LTD [GB]) [X] 1-7,12,13 * column 4, line 29 - column 5, line 34; figure 1 * [A] 8-11 | by applicant | US3535859 | EP0680687 | US5904032 | EP1180322 |