EP1388674 - Retaining device for the shoe of a pipe line [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2006/45] | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property, Feldkircherstrasse 100, Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | ||
Former [2004/07] | For all designated states HILTI Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property, Feldkircherstrasse 100, Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mirsberger, Helmut Friedrich-List-Strasse 118 81377 München / DE | 02 /
Birnbaum, Ulrich Buigenweg 4 Epfenhausen 86929 Penzing / DE | [2004/07] | Representative(s) | Wildi, Roland Hilti Aktiengesellschaft, Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2009/38] |
Former [2004/07] | Wildi, Roland Hilti Aktiengesellschaft, Corporate Intellectual Property, Feldkircherstrasse 100, Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | Application number, filing date | 03102411.0 | 04.08.2003 | [2004/07] | Priority number, date | DE20021036550 | 08.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10236550 | [2004/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1388674 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1388674 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16B2/12 | [2004/07] | CPC: |
F16B2/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/07] | Title | German: | Haltevorrichtung für ein Leitungsstrang-Schuhelement | [2004/07] | English: | Retaining device for the shoe of a pipe line | [2004/07] | French: | Dispositif de fixation d'un sabot de ligne de conduite | [2004/07] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 19.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.11.2006 | CZ | 08.11.2006 | EE | 08.11.2006 | FI | 08.11.2006 | IE | 08.11.2006 | RO | 08.11.2006 | SI | 08.11.2006 | SK | 08.11.2006 | TR | 08.11.2006 | BG | 08.02.2007 | SE | 08.02.2007 | GR | 09.02.2007 | PT | 09.04.2007 | HU | 09.05.2007 | LU | 04.08.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/38] | CY | 08.11.2006 | |
CZ | 08.11.2006 | ||
EE | 08.11.2006 | ||
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
IE | 08.11.2006 | ||
RO | 08.11.2006 | ||
SI | 08.11.2006 | ||
SK | 08.11.2006 | ||
BG | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
GR | 09.02.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
LU | 04.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 08.11.2006 | |
EE | 08.11.2006 | ||
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
IE | 08.11.2006 | ||
RO | 08.11.2006 | ||
SI | 08.11.2006 | ||
SK | 08.11.2006 | ||
BG | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
GR | 09.02.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 08.11.2006 | |
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
IE | 08.11.2006 | ||
RO | 08.11.2006 | ||
SI | 08.11.2006 | ||
SK | 08.11.2006 | ||
BG | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
GR | 09.02.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | CZ | 08.11.2006 | |
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
IE | 08.11.2006 | ||
RO | 08.11.2006 | ||
SI | 08.11.2006 | ||
SK | 08.11.2006 | ||
BG | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | CZ | 08.11.2006 | |
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
IE | 08.11.2006 | ||
IT | 08.11.2006 | ||
RO | 08.11.2006 | ||
SI | 08.11.2006 | ||
SK | 08.11.2006 | ||
BG | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | CZ | 08.11.2006 | |
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
IE | 08.11.2006 | ||
IT | 08.11.2006 | ||
RO | 08.11.2006 | ||
BG | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 08.11.2006 | |
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
IT | 08.11.2006 | ||
RO | 08.11.2006 | ||
BG | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | CZ | 08.11.2006 | |
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
IT | 08.11.2006 | ||
BG | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 08.11.2006 | |
BG | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0456851 (BERNECKER KLAUS DIETER [DE]) [X] 1,5* column 9, line 42 - column 11, line 33; figures 1,2,4,5 *; | [X]DE29922212U (STANGE PAUL [DE]) [X] 1,5 * page 3, line 18 - page 5, line 9; figures 1-4A *; | [X]EP1043532 (STANGE PAUL [DE]) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0034] * * figures 14,20,21 * | by applicant | DE19653538 |