EP1506929 - Device for introducing bulk material in a multiplicity of conveying lines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.2006 [2006/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PAUL WURTH S.A. 32 rue d'Alsace 1122 Luxembourg / LU | [2005/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kroemmer, Yvan 5 route de Luxembourg 8360 Goetzingen / LU | [2005/07] | Representative(s) | Beissel, Jean, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2005/07] | Beissel, Jean, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A., 234, route d'Arlon, B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 03102503.4 | 12.08.2003 | [2005/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1506929 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/72, B65G53/22 | [2005/07] | CPC: |
B65G53/22 (EP);
B65G47/72 (EP);
B65G53/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/44] |
Former [2005/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Einleiten von Schüttgut in eine Vielzahl von Förderleitungen | [2005/07] | English: | Device for introducing bulk material in a multiplicity of conveying lines | [2005/07] | French: | Dispositif pour l'introduction de matières en vrac dans des conduites d'acheminement | [2005/07] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/21] | 19.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.09.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.09.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE196014 (KIHM M) [X] 1,5,6 * the whole document *; | [X]DE291436 (DENNY M) [X] 1 * page 1, line 47 - page 3, line 10 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]FR1507545 (FRANZ JOS WASCHLE MASCHINENFAB) [X] 1,5,6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0349690 (MATSUI MFG CO [JP]) [A] 1 * column 19, line 12 - line 20 * * column 20, line 14 - line 49 ** figure 14 *; | [X]DE29500305U (BABCOCK MATERIALS HANDLING DIV [DE]) [X] 1,5,6,10 * page 4 - page 5; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [AD]WO0222476 (WURTH PAUL SA [LU], et al) [AD] 1,3-5,9 * page 6, line 22 - page 11, line 3 * * figures 4,5 * |