EP1398166 - Ink jet recording material and light-stabilising agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [2004/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Loccufier, Johan AGFA-GEVAERT Corporate IP Dpt. 3800 Septestr. 27 2640, Mortsel / BE | 02 /
Lingier, Stefaan AGFA-GEVAERT Corporate IP Dpt. 3800 Septestr. 27 2640, Mortsel / BE | [2004/12] | Application number, filing date | 03102692.5 | 04.09.2003 | [2004/12] | Priority number, date | EP20020102340 | 11.09.2002 Original published format: EP 02102340 | [2004/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1398166 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1398166 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/52, C07D211/72, C07D211/62, C07D211/94, C07D211/58, C07D207/16, C07D405/12, C07D405/14 | [2006/43] | CPC: |
B41M5/5227 (EP);
C07D207/16 (EP);
C07D207/46 (EP);
C07D211/58 (EP);
C07D211/72 (EP);
C07D211/94 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2004/12] | B41M5/00, C07D211/72, C07D211/62, C07D211/94, C07D211/58, C07D207/16, C07D405/12, C07D405/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/50] |
Former [2004/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsmaterial und Lichtschutzmittel | [2004/12] | English: | Ink jet recording material and light-stabilising agent | [2004/12] | French: | Matériau d'enregistrement par jet d'encre et photostabilisateur | [2004/12] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 27.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0120078 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH]) [A] 8 * page 4, line 11 - page 16 ** example - *; | [A] - "Ink jet recording material - contg. hindered amine cpd., e.g. 4-benzoyloxy-2,2,6,6-tetra:methyl piperidine or 2,2,6,6-tetra:methyl-4-piperidinol", DERWENT, XP002225590 [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US3739393 | US3805273 | US3891121 | JPS61146591 | EP0500021 | EP0634286 | WO0120078 | US6232469 |