EP1403423 - Head box with swirl inducer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.01.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2007 | Refusal of application | published on 14.02.2007 [2007/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2004/14] | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruf, Wolfgang Wedelstr. 3/2 89542, Herbrechtingen / DE | 02 /
Prössl, Jürgen Happenweiler 420 88263, Horgenzell / DE | 03 /
Schwaner, Mathias Bischof-Sproll-Weg 9 88212, Ravensburg / DE | 04 /
Henssler, Joachim Franz-Joachim-Beich-Str. 19 88213, Ravensburg / DE | 05 /
Wischmann, Ralf Gartenstr. 18 88368, Bergatreute / DE | [2004/14] | Representative(s) | Kunze, Klaus, et al Voith Paper Holding GmbH & Co. KG Abteilung zjp Sankt Poeltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Kunze, Klaus, et al Voith Paper Holding GmbH & Co. KG Abteilung zjp Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 03102711.3 | 05.09.2003 | [2004/14] | Priority number, date | DE2002145157 | 27.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10245157 | [2004/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1403423 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D21F1/02 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
D21F1/028 (EP);
D21F1/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/14] | Title | German: | Stoffauflauf mit Drallerzeuger | [2004/14] | English: | Head box with swirl inducer | [2004/14] | French: | Caisse de tête avec générateur de courant tourbillonaire | [2004/14] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 26.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/07] | 06.10.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0211607 (SEISHI GIJUTSU KENKYU KUMIAI [JP]) [XD] 1-8,14,15,18,20,22,23,26,30 * page 5, line 11 - line 25 * * claim - * * figure - *; | [A]EP0769586 (PAPER SCIENCE & TECH INST INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]DE10150951 (VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0040] ** figure - * |