EP1398983 - Method for remotely programming a mobile phone and implementation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/12] | Method for remotely programming of a logic in a mobile phone and implementation system | ||
[2007/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAGEM Communication Le Ponant de Paris 27, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2006/04] |
Former [2004/12] | For all designated states SAGEM S.A. 27, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRESSE, Philippe 11, rue des Ancolies 95490, VAUREAL / FR | [2004/12] | Representative(s) | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie, et al SCHMIT CHRETIEN 8, Place du Ponceau 95000 Cergy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/12] | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie, et al Cabinet Christian Schmit et Associés, 8, place du Ponceau 95000 Cergy / FR | Application number, filing date | 03102734.5 | 11.09.2003 | [2004/12] | Priority number, date | FR20020011343 | 12.09.2002 Original published format: FR 0211343 | [2004/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1398983 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1398983 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/32 | [2004/12] | CPC: |
H04W8/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/50] |
Former [2004/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fernprogrammierungsverfahren eines Mobiltelefons und System dafür | [2007/08] | English: | Method for remotely programming a mobile phone and implementation system | [2007/08] | French: | Procédé de mise à jour à distance d'un logiciel embarqué dans un téléphone mobile et système de mise en oeuvre | [2007/08] |
Former [2004/12] | Fernprogrammierungsverfahren einer Logik in einem Mobiltelefon und System dafür | ||
Former [2004/12] | Method for remotely programming of a logic in a mobile phone and implementation system | ||
Former [2004/12] | Procédé de mise à jour à distance d'un logiciel embarqué dans un Téléphone mobile et système de mise en oeuvre | Examination procedure | 15.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 11.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0459344 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1-20 * column 3, line 47 - line 51 * * abstract *; | [A]GB2256113 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1-20 * abstract *; | [A]US5349697 (PELKONEN SAKARI [FI]) [A] 1,20 * abstract ** figure 1 *; | [A]EP0804045 (TELIA AB [SE]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 54 *; | [X]GB2350749 (MOTOROLA LTD [GB]) [X] 1,20 * abstract * * figure 1 * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO0117214 (WEBLINK WIRELESS INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * page 6, line 5 - line 33 *; | [A]WO0133867 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * |